EP1705003 - Processless lithographic printing plates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa Graphics N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [2007/09] |
Former [2006/39] | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Groenendaal, Lambertus Corporate IP Department 3800 AGFA-GEVAERT Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | 02 /
Van Aert, Hubertus Corporate IP Department 3800 AGFA-GEVAERT Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | 03 /
Williamson, Alexander Corporate IP Department 3800 AGFA-GEVAERT Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | 04 /
Andriessen, Hieronymus Corporate IP Department 3800 AGFA-GEVAERT Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [2006/39] | Representative(s) | Goedeweeck, Rudi, et al AGFA NV Intellectual Property Department Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/09] | Goedeweeck, Rudi, et al Agfa Graphics N.V. IP Department 3622 Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | Application number, filing date | 05102222.6 | 21.03.2005 | [2006/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1705003 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1705003 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B41C1/10, B41M5/36 | [2006/39] | CPC: |
B41C1/1041 (EP);
B41M5/368 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/22] |
Former [2006/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Entwicklungsfreie Flachdruckplatten | [2006/39] | English: | Processless lithographic printing plates | [2006/39] | French: | Plaques d'impression lithographiques sans développement. | [2006/39] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/19] | 18.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO02053627 (KODAK POLYCHROME GRAPHICS L L [US]) [AD] 1-12* claims 1-3,34,42-44 *; | [AD]US2004023155 (HAYAKAWA EIJI [JP], et al) [AD] 1-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] - [0019] - [0024] , [0075] - [0082] * | by applicant | EP0580393 | EP0625728 | US5605780 | EP0823327 | EP0825927 | EP0864420 | EP0894622 | EP0901902 |