EP1609584 - A method of manufacturing composite structural beams for aircraft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2008 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alenia Aeronautica S.p.A. Viale dell'Aeronautica s.n.c. 80038 Pomigliano d'Arco (Napoli) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/52] | For all designated states Alenia Aeronautica S.p.A. Viale Dell'Aeronautica s.n. 80038 Pomigliano D'Arco (Napoli) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suriano, Carmine Via Ciampitti 61 71100 Foggia / IT | [2005/52] | Representative(s) | Fioravanti, Corrado, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/52] | Fioravanti, Corrado, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia, 8 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 05102276.2 | 22.03.2005 | [2005/52] | Priority number, date | IT2004TO00410 | 21.06.2004 Original published format: IT TO20040410 | [2005/52] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1609584 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1609584 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/34, B29D31/00 | [2005/52] | CPC: |
B29C70/345 (EP,US);
B29C70/342 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2006/36] |
Former [2005/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ein Verfahren zur Herstellung eines strukturellen Verbundträgers für Flugzeuge | [2005/52] | English: | A method of manufacturing composite structural beams for aircraft | [2005/52] | French: | Un procédé de production d'une poutre composite structurelle pour aéronef | [2005/52] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 11.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2268704 (BRITISH AEROSPACE [GB]) [A] 1-6* page 6, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3; figures 1,3 *; | [A]US5538589 (JENSEN DONALD A [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 54; figures 1,2a-2i *; | [X]US5954898 (MCKAGUE ELBERT LEE [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 17 - line 27 * * column 7, line 37 - column 8, line 19; figure 4 * * column 8, line 31 - line 40; figure 6 * * column 8, line 64 - column 9, line 37; figure 8 * * column 9, line 61 - column 10, line 9; figure 9 * * column 10, line 23 - column 11, line 7; figure 10 *; | [A]US6217000 (YOUNIE MARK L [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]EP1145829 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0023]; figures 1-7 * |