Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6956454 | Global Dossier | 18.10.2005 | B1 | US2005219023 | 06.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0403460 | 01.04.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1583130 | Global Dossier | 18.02.2009 | B1 | EP1583130 | 05.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0403460 | 01.04.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE423389T | 15.03.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FR0403460 | 01.04.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100530484C | 19.08.2009 | C | CN1677603 | 05.10.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0403460 | 01.04.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602005012749D1 | 02.04.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR0403460 | 01.04.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2319787T | 12.05.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR0403460 | 01.04.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2868596 | 26.05.2006 | B1 | FR2868596 | 07.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0403460 | 01.04.2004 |