EP1583130 - Magnetic subassembly of an electrical breaker apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.12.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 35, rue Joseph Monier 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 35 Rue Joseph Monier 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | ||
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS 89, boulevard Franklin Roosevelt 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Garcia, José 23 rue de la Croix de Molphey 21410 Agey / FR | 02 /
Larcher, Patrick 14 rue des Grands Clos 21121 Ahuy / FR | 03 /
Rivals, Arnaud 37C, rue de Larrey 21000 Dijon / FR | [2008/40] |
Former [2005/40] | 01 /
Garcia, José 23 rue de la Croix de Molphey 21410, Agey / FR | ||
02 /
Larcher, Patrick 14 rue des Grands Clos 21121, Ahuy / FR | |||
03 /
Rivals, Arnaud 37C, rue de Larrey 21000, Dijon / FR | Representative(s) | Dufresne, Thierry Schneider Electric Industries SAS Service Propriété Industrielle 35 rue Joseph Monier - CS 30323 92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | Dufresne, Thierry Schneider Electric Industries SAS Service Propriété Industrielle 89,boulevard Franklin Roosevelt 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Application number, filing date | 05102436.2 | 25.03.2005 | [2005/40] | Priority number, date | FR20040003460 | 01.04.2004 Original published format: FR 0403460 | [2005/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1583130 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1583130 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01H71/24 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
H01H71/2463 (EP,US);
H01H71/2454 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/40] | Title | German: | Magnetische Untereinheit für ein elektrisches Schaltgerät | [2005/40] | English: | Magnetic subassembly of an electrical breaker apparatus | [2005/40] | French: | sous-ensemble magnétique d'un appareil électrique interrupteur | [2005/40] | Examination procedure | 31.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/52] | 11.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.02.2009 | CY | 18.02.2009 | CZ | 18.02.2009 | DK | 18.02.2009 | EE | 18.02.2009 | FI | 18.02.2009 | IE | 18.02.2009 | LT | 18.02.2009 | NL | 18.02.2009 | PL | 18.02.2009 | RO | 18.02.2009 | SI | 18.02.2009 | SK | 18.02.2009 | LU | 25.03.2009 | BE | 31.03.2009 | CH | 31.03.2009 | LI | 31.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | BG | 18.05.2009 | GB | 18.05.2009 | SE | 18.05.2009 | GR | 19.05.2009 | IS | 18.06.2009 | PT | 27.07.2009 | HU | 19.08.2009 | [2011/45] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
LU | 25.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
GB | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
HU | 19.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
LU | 25.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
GB | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
GB | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
GB | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/48] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IE | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/45] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
NL | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2531215 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE) [A] 1 * page 6 - page 7; figure - *; | [A]EP0515292 (MERLIN GERIN [FR]) [A] 1* column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 6; figure 2 *; | [A]WO9963564 (HAGER ELECTRO [FR], et al) [A] 1 * page 6, line 7 - line 35; figure 1 * |