EP1591883 - Method and device for controlling a plurality of graphic displays [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.05.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2005/44] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stang, Udo Asamstr. 29 93051 Regensburg / DE | [2005/44] | Application number, filing date | 05102489.1 | 30.03.2005 | [2005/44] | Priority number, date | DE20041020541 | 27.04.2004 Original published format: DE102004020541 | [2005/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1591883 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1591883 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/14 | [2005/44] | CPC: |
G06F3/147 (EP);
G06F3/1431 (EP);
G09G5/006 (EP);
G09G5/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/48] |
Former [2005/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Anordnung und Verfahren zur Ansteuerung mehrerer Grafikdisplays | [2005/44] | English: | Method and device for controlling a plurality of graphic displays | [2005/44] | French: | Méthode et dispositif de commande de plusieurs dispositifs d'affichage graphique | [2005/44] | Examination procedure | 11.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/22] | 09.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.02.2013 | 25.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/25] | 04.02.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/25] | 19.02.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.06.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH03132789 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]WO9734220 (SIEMENS NIXDORF INF SYST [DE], et al) [A] 1,10* page 6, line 13 - page 7, line 21; figure 2 * |