EP1586994 - System and method for dynamic binding of user interface controls and commands [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2018/21] |
Former [2015/12] | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | ||
Former [2005/42] | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jenni, David J. c/o MICROSOFT CORPORATION, One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 02 /
Cooper, Kenneth B. c/o MICROSOFT CORPORATION, One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 03 /
Roeder, Lutz c/o MICROSOFT CORPORATION, One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 04 /
Gupta, Namita c/o MICROSOFT CORPORATION, One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 05 /
Bent, Samuel W. c/o MICROSOFT CORPORATION, One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 06 /
Peters, Ted A. c/o MICROSOFT CORPORATION, One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2018/21] |
Former [2005/42] | 01 /
Jenni, David J. c/o MICROSOFT CORPORATION, One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | ||
02 /
Cooper, Kenneth B. c/o MICROSOFT CORPORATION, One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | |||
03 /
Roeder, Lutz c/o MICROSOFT CORPORATION, One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | |||
04 /
Gupta, Namita c/o MICROSOFT CORPORATION, One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | |||
05 /
Bent, Samuel W. c/o MICROSOFT CORPORATION, One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | |||
06 /
Peters, Ted A. c/o MICROSOFT CORPORATION, One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2018/21] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/42] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05102665.6 | 05.04.2005 | [2005/42] | Priority number, date | US20040822910 | 13.04.2004 Original published format: US 822910 | [2005/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1586994 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1586994 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | [2007/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1586994 | Date: | 23.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445, G06F9/44 | [2007/41] | CPC: |
G06F8/38 (EP,KR,US);
G06F8/315 (KR);
G06F8/65 (KR);
G06F9/445 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2005/42] | G06F9/445 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/21] |
Former [2005/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur dynamischen Bindung von Benutzerschnittstellenelementen und Anweisungen | [2005/42] | English: | System and method for dynamic binding of user interface controls and commands | [2005/42] | French: | Système et méthode de liaison dynamique des composants d'une interface graphique et des commandes d'opération | [2005/42] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 03.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.09.2017 | 27.09.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 31.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.03.2008 | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.04.2005 | AT | 23.05.2018 | CY | 23.05.2018 | CZ | 23.05.2018 | DK | 23.05.2018 | EE | 23.05.2018 | FI | 23.05.2018 | LT | 23.05.2018 | MC | 23.05.2018 | PL | 23.05.2018 | RO | 23.05.2018 | SE | 23.05.2018 | SI | 23.05.2018 | SK | 23.05.2018 | TR | 23.05.2018 | BG | 23.08.2018 | GR | 24.08.2018 | IS | 23.09.2018 | PT | 24.09.2018 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/31] | AT | 23.05.2018 | |
CY | 23.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IS | 23.09.2018 | ||
PT | 24.09.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 23.05.2018 | |
CY | 23.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
PT | 24.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
PT | 24.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AT | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 23.05.2018 | |
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | FI | 23.05.2018 | |
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 23.05.2018 | |
LT | 23.05.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9715883 (VIEWSOFT INC [US]) [A] 1-38 * abstract * * page 1, lines 11-14 * * page 6, line 20 - page 7, line 2 * * page 7, lines 17-21 * * page 10, lines 10-22 * * page 11, line 18 - page 12, line 5 * * page 14, line 20 - page 16, line 10 * * page 23, lines 9-18 * * page 25, lines 2-16 * * page 32, line 17 - page 34, line 13 * * pages 61-62 ** claims 1,3,6,8 *; | [X]US6330006 (GOODISMAN AARON [US]) [X] 1-38 * abstract * * column 1, lines 8-10,32-64 * * column 2, line 11 - column 3, line 7 * * column 5, lines 14-36 * * column 6, lines 13-26 * * column 6, line 62 - column 7, line 45 * * column 8, lines 52-64 * * column 14, lines 28-59 * * claims 1-13 *; | [X]US2003035003 (MARCOS PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1-38 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraphs [0020] - [0022] * * paragraphs [0024] - [0026] * * paragraphs [0047] - [0050] * * paragraphs [0072] - [0077] * * paragraphs [0087] , [0088] * * paragraphs [0120] - [0125] * * claim 1 * | Examination | - RECTOR B, "Introducing Longhorn for Developers - Chapter 3: Controls and XAML", INTERNET CITATION, (200312), pages 1 - 23, URL: http://msdn.microsoft.com/en-us/library/aa479869(printer).aspx, (20081125), XP002505582 |