EP1589769 - predictive lossless coding of images and video [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.11.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 07.12.2011 [2011/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mukerjee, Kunal c/o MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way 98052, Redmond / US | [2005/43] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/43] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05102696.1 | 06.04.2005 | [2005/43] | Priority number, date | US20040826842 | 15.04.2004 Original published format: US 826842 | [2005/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1589769 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/34, H04N7/26 | [2005/43] | CPC: |
H04N19/14 (EP,BR,US);
H04N19/105 (EP,BR,US);
E01C5/005 (KR);
E01C11/224 (KR);
H04N19/13 (EP,BR,US);
H04N19/176 (EP,BR,US);
H04N19/46 (EP,BR,US);
H04N19/593 (EP,BR,US);
E01C2201/02 (KR);
E01C2201/20 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/43] | Title | German: | Prädiktive Verlustfreiekodierung von Video und Bildern | [2005/43] | English: | predictive lossless coding of images and video | [2005/43] | French: | Codage de vidéo et d' images prédictif sans perte | [2005/43] | Examination procedure | 21.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/20] | 01.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 23.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/49] | 24.06.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/49] | 18.07.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.05.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6654503 (SUDHARSANAN SUBRAMANIA [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6,8,10,12,15,16,18,20 * column 3, line 13 - column 5, line 45; figures 1A,1B,1C * [Y] 2,9,11,13,14,19,21; | [Y] - MUKERJEE K, "Decaying tree lossless coding for image and video", DATA COMPRESSION CONFERENCE, 2004. PROCEEDINGS. DCC 2004 SNOWBIRD, UT, USA MARCH 23-25, 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20040323), ISBN 0-7695-2082-0, pages 553 - 553, XP010692611 [Y] 2,11,14,19,21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/DCC.2004.1281529 | [Y] - MEMON N ET AL, "RECENT DEVELOPMENTS IN CONTEXT-BASED PREDICTIVE TECHNIQUES FOR LOSSLESS IMAGE COMPRESSION", COMPUTER JOURNAL, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (1997), vol. 40, no. 2/3, ISSN 0010-4620, pages 128 - 136, XP000199882 [Y] 9,13 * paragraphs [0002] , [03.2]; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/comjnl/40.2_and_3.127 | [A] - WEINBERGER M J ET AL, "LOCO-I: a low complexity, context-based, lossless image compression algorithm", DATA COMPRESSION CONFERENCE, 1996. DCC '96. PROCEEDINGS SNOWBIRD, UT, USA 31 MARCH-3 APRIL 1996, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19960331), ISBN 0-8186-7358-3, pages 140 - 149, XP010156555 [A] 1-21 * paragraph [0002] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/DCC.1996.488319 | Examination | - "LOSSLESS AND NEAR-LOSSLESS CODING OF CONTINUOUS TONE STILL IMAGES (JPEG-LS)", ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG1 FCD 14495 - PUBLIC DRAFT, XX, XX, (19970716), pages I - IV,1, XP002260316 |