EP1715656 - Offering a push service to a wireless device using a push proxy which monitors the coverage state of the device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
Former [2006/43] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Philip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fritsch, Brindusa 9 Cherry Post Crescent Toronto Ontario M9C 2J9 / CA | 02 /
Bibr, Viera 6479 McNiven Road, Box 828 Kilbride Ontario L0P 1G0 / CA | 03 /
Matovsky, Michael 52 Devondale Avenue Toronto Ontario M2R 2E2 / CA | 04 /
Shenfield, Michael 38 Stockdale Crescent Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 3S9 / CA | 05 /
Vitanov, Kamen B. 5530 Glen Erin Dive, Unit 30 Mississauga Ontario L5M 6E8 / CA | [2006/43] | Representative(s) | Patel, Binesh, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Rickard, David John, et al Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | ||
Former [2006/43] | Rickard, David John, et al 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 05103098.9 | 18.04.2005 | [2006/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1715656 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1715656 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08 | [2006/43] | CPC: |
H04W4/16 (EP);
H04L67/04 (EP);
H04L67/55 (EP);
H04W4/10 (EP);
H04W76/45 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/43] | Extension states | AL | 28.04.2005 | BA | 28.04.2005 | HR | 28.04.2005 | LV | 28.04.2005 | MK | 28.04.2005 | YU | 28.04.2005 | Title | German: | Realisierung eines Push-Dienstens für ein drahtloses Endgerät mit Hilfe eines Push-Proxies, der den Funkbedeckungszustand des Endgerätes überwacht | [2006/43] | English: | Offering a push service to a wireless device using a push proxy which monitors the coverage state of the device | [2006/43] | French: | Réalisation d'un service Push pour un équipement sans fil à l'aide d'un proxy Push, qui surveille l'état de couverture de l'équipement | [2006/43] | Examination procedure | 28.04.2005 | Examination requested [2006/43] | 19.02.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.05.2008 | BE | 14.05.2008 | CY | 14.05.2008 | CZ | 14.05.2008 | DK | 14.05.2008 | EE | 14.05.2008 | FI | 14.05.2008 | IT | 14.05.2008 | LT | 14.05.2008 | NL | 14.05.2008 | PL | 14.05.2008 | RO | 14.05.2008 | SI | 14.05.2008 | SK | 14.05.2008 | TR | 14.05.2008 | BG | 14.08.2008 | SE | 14.08.2008 | GR | 15.08.2008 | ES | 25.08.2008 | IS | 14.09.2008 | PT | 14.10.2008 | HU | 15.11.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
IT | 14.05.2008 | ||
LT | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
GR | 15.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
HU | 15.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
IT | 14.05.2008 | ||
LT | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
GR | 15.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/45] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
IT | 14.05.2008 | ||
LT | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
LT | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
LT | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
LT | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
LT | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 14.05.2008 | |
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 14.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2294132 (MARCONI GEC LTD [GB]) [A] 5-8,12-14* page 4, line 15 - line 27 *; | [Y]US6757717 (GOLDSTEIN LEONID [IL]) [Y] 5-7,12-14 * column 1, line 27 - line 32; figure 2 *; | [A]US2004148400 (MOSTAFA MIRAJ [FI]) [A] 5-8,12-14 * paragraph [0113]; figure 5 *; | [XY] - TOSI D, "An advanced architecture for push services", WEB INFORMATION SYSTEMS ENGINEERING WORKSHOPS, 2003. PROCEEDINGS. FOURTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ROME, ITALY 13 DEC. 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (2003), ISBN 0-7695-2103-7, pages 193 - 200, XP010697505 [X] 1-4,8-11,15,16 * abstract * * page 3; figure 1 * * page 6 * [Y] 5-7,12-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WISEW.2003.1286802 | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Support of Push service (Release 5); 3GPP TR 23.875", ETSI STANDARDS, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE, SOPHIA-ANTIPO, FR, (200203), no. V510, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014021954 [A] 1-4,8-11,15,16 * page 13 - page 14; figure 6.6 * * page 23 - page 27 * | by applicant | US6757717 |