EP1607771 - Night vision system for motor vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/51] | Camera objective | ||
[2011/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2005/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Apel, Uwe Talstrasse 2 72666, Neckartailfingen / DE | 02 /
Schick, Jens Im Seele 8 71083, Herrenberg / DE | 03 /
Fritz, Steffen Hofstaettstrasse 3 75449, Wurmberg / DE | [2005/51] | Application number, filing date | 05103210.0 | 21.04.2005 | [2005/51] | Priority number, date | DE20041028616 | 12.06.2004 Original published format: DE102004028616 | [2005/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1607771 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1607771 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/00, G02B23/12, G03B9/02 | [2005/51] | CPC: |
G02B5/005 (EP);
G02B23/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/35] |
Former [2005/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Nachtsichtsystem für Kraftfahrzeuge | [2011/08] | English: | Night vision system for motor vehicles | [2011/08] | French: | Système de vision nocturne pour véhicules à moteur | [2011/08] |
Former [2005/51] | Kameraobjektiv | ||
Former [2005/51] | Camera objective | ||
Former [2005/51] | Objectif de caméra | Examination procedure | 21.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/31] | 20.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.07.2006 | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2153198 (AGFA GEVAERT AG) [X] 1-3,5-7,9 * pages 2-3; figure 1 *; | [A]DE2638276 (REMY ERNST DIPL PHYS DR) [A] 1 * page 6, paragraph 3 - page 7; claim 1 *; | [X]US4376889 (SWIFT DAVID W [GB]) [X] 1-3,5 * column 2, line 67 - column 4, line 7 * * column 5, lines 46-53 *; | [DA]DE3226807 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE3313899 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE4032927 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 11* abstract *; | [X]US5212589 (GOODMAN DOUGLAS S [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8 * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 49; figures 2,3 *; | [PX]CH694174 (LEICA VECTRONIX AG [CH]) [PX] 1-5,9,11 * column 4, line 21 - column 6, line 6 * * column 8, line 21 - column 10, line 4; figures 2-8 * | Examination | EP1465002 | by applicant | DE2153198 | US4376889 | US5212589 |