EP1600277 - Cooling Device and cooling process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/48] | Cooling Device | ||
[2014/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2016 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states battenfeld-cincinnati Germany GmbH Königstraße 53 32547 Bad Oeynhausen / DE | [2015/16] |
Former [2011/35] | For all designated states battenfeld-cincinnati Germany GmbH Königstrasse 53 32547 Bad Oeynhausen / DE | ||
Former [2010/40] | For all designated states Battenfeld-cincinnati Germany GmbH Stormstrasse 11-13 57223 Kreuztal / DE | ||
Former [2005/48] | For all designated states Battenfeld Extrusionstechnik GmbH Königstrasse 53 32547 Bad Oeynhausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krampf, Nikolaus Bessinger Strasse 32547 Bad Oeynhausen / DE | 02 /
Huth, Kurt Schreiberweg 7 86399 Bobingen / DE | [2005/48] | Application number, filing date | 05103331.4 | 25.04.2005 | [2005/48] | Priority number, date | DE20041026027 | 27.05.2004 Original published format: DE102004026027 | [2005/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1600277 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1600277 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | [2011/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1600277 | Date: | 15.04.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/88, B29C47/90 | [2005/48] | CPC: |
B29C48/9155 (EP,US);
B29C48/08 (EP,US);
B29C48/90 (EP,US);
B29C48/906 (EP,US);
B29C48/911 (EP,US);
B29C48/914 (EP,US);
B29C48/915 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/16] |
Former [2005/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kühlvorrichtung und Kühlverfahren | [2014/45] | English: | Cooling Device and cooling process | [2014/45] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de refroidissement | [2014/45] |
Former [2005/48] | Kühlvorrichtung | ||
Former [2005/48] | Cooling Device | ||
Former [2005/48] | Dispositif de refroidissement | Examination procedure | 23.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/44] | 29.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.04.2005 | BG | 15.04.2015 | CY | 15.04.2015 | CZ | 15.04.2015 | DK | 15.04.2015 | EE | 15.04.2015 | ES | 15.04.2015 | FI | 15.04.2015 | LT | 15.04.2015 | MC | 15.04.2015 | RO | 15.04.2015 | SE | 15.04.2015 | SI | 15.04.2015 | SK | 15.04.2015 | IE | 25.04.2015 | LU | 25.04.2015 | BE | 30.04.2015 | GR | 16.07.2015 | IS | 15.08.2015 | PT | 17.08.2015 | [2018/02] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 25.04.2005 | |
BG | 15.04.2015 | ||
CY | 15.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SE | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
IE | 25.04.2015 | ||
BE | 30.04.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 15.04.2015 | |
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
IE | 25.04.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CZ | 15.04.2015 | |
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
IE | 25.04.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 15.04.2015 | |
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | DK | 15.04.2015 | |
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | DK | 15.04.2015 | |
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 15.04.2015 | |
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 15.04.2015 | |
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3351697 (WALTER HUFNAGEL, et al) [X] 1-7,11 * column 4, line 30 - line 71; figure 1 * [I] 8-10; | [XI]DE2658680 (BATYREV) [X] 1-7,11 * page 4, line 47 - page 5, line 28; figure 2; claim 18 * [I] 8-10; | [XI]US4105386 (THIEL ALFONS W, et al) [X] 1-7,9-11 * figures 1-3,6,7,15 * [I] 8; | [XI]GB1579234 (UNILEVER LTD) [X] 1-7,11 * page 8, line 60 - page 9, line 32; figures 1-3; claim 1 * [I] 8-10; | [XI]JPS5640526 (TEIJIN LTD) [X] 1-7,11 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * [I] 8-10; | [XI]DE3521331 (BARMAG BARMER MASCHF [DE]) [X] 1-7,11 * page 14, line 13 - page 16, line 4; figure 1; claims 1,16 * [I] 8-10; | [XI]DE3802095 (HINTERKEUSER WILLI DIPL ING [DE]) [X] 1-7,11 * column 1, lines 3-62; figures a,b * [I] 8-10; | [XI]EP0442253 (CHEMIEFASER LENZING AG [AT]) [X] 1-7,11 * page 2, line 52 - page 3, line 41; figures 1,2,4,5 * [I] 8-10; | [XI]JPH05309679 (NITTO BOSEKI CO LTD) [X] 1-4,7,8 * paragraphs [0016] - [0021] - [0023]; figures 1,2 * * abstract * [I] 5,6,9-11; | [XI]DE19522118 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1-7,11 * page 4, line 47 - page 5, line 28; figure 2; claim 18 * [I] 4-6,8-10; | [XI]US5807516 (WOLSTENHOLME JACK [CA], et al) [X] 1-7,11 * column 4, line 8 - column 5, line 7; figure 1 * [I] 8-10; | [XI]US6071110 (MIKKELSEN OEYSTEIN [US]) [X] 1-8,11 * column 3, line 62 - column 5, line 24; figures 3,4 *[I] 9,10 |