15.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
13.02.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] |
07.03.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] |
05.03.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
05.03.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
28.10.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
20.09.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 23.10.2013 [2013/43] |
20.09.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 23.10.2013 [2013/43] |
16.08.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.06.2013 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.04.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.02.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.08.2012 |
Change - applicant |
published on 19.09.2012 [2012/38] |
03.04.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.04.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.04.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.04.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.03.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.02.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.12.2007 |
Change - representative |
published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] |
05.10.2007 |
First examination report |
|
29.09.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.07.2007 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
26.04.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.04.2007 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
23.01.2007 |
New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
12.01.2007 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 14.02.2007 [2007/07] |
24.11.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.12.2006 [2006/52] |
05.05.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.06.2006 [2006/23] |