EP1666820 - Refrigerator with improved RFID reader configuration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416 Maetan 3-Dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNG, Woon Sung 204, 1002-4, Yeongtong-Dong, Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-Si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
KIM, Hoon 10-305, Maetan 3rd Samsung Apt., Maetan-Dong Yeongtong-Gu, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | 03 /
SON, Chang Ho 8-402, Samsung 3rd Apt., Maetan-4-Dong Yeongtong-Dong, Yeongtong-Gu, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | 04 /
PARK, You Na 201, 2-18, Yangjae-1-Dong, Seocho-Gu Seoul / KR | 05 /
LEE, Hye Rim 102, 1239-10, Maetan-3-Dong, Yeongtong-Gu,Suwon-Si Gyeonggi-Do / KR | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Hewett, Jonathan Michael Richard, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2014/15] |
Former [2008/02] | Hewett, Jonathan Michael Richard, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | ||
Former [2006/23] | Geary, Stuart Lloyd, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 05103403.1 | 26.04.2005 | [2006/23] | Priority number, date | KR20040099391 | 30.11.2004 Original published format: KR 2004099391 | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1666820 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1666820 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F25D29/00, G06K7/10 | [2013/43] | CPC: |
G06K7/10336 (EP,US);
F25D11/00 (KR);
F25D23/00 (KR);
F25D29/005 (EP,US);
F25D2700/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/23] | F25D29/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/07] |
Former [2006/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kühlgerät mit verbesserter RFID-Leser Anordnung | [2006/23] | English: | Refrigerator with improved RFID reader configuration | [2006/23] | French: | Réfrigérateur ayant une disposition améliorée des lecteurs de puces RFID | [2006/23] | Examination procedure | 14.11.2006 | Examination requested [2006/52] | 08.12.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.04.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.10.2007 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.01.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 10.06.2014 | GB | 09.07.2014 | [2015/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JP2002081848 ; | [A]US5274392 (D HONT LOEK [NL], et al); | [A]US5850416 (MYER ROBERT EVAN [US]); | [A]US2002024441 (TERASHIMA MASAHIRO [JP], et al); | [Y]EP1205720 (LIEBHERR HAUSGERAETE [DE]); | [Y]US2003209601 (CHUNG KEVIN KWONG-TAI [US]); | US6703935 [ ] (CHUNG KEVIN KWONG-TAI [US], et al) | Examination | US2002183882 | by applicant | US2002183882 | US2003209601 | US6703935 |