EP1598822 - Secure storage on recordable medium in a content protection system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, PT | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/12] |
Former [2005/47] | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alkove, James M. c/o MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 02 /
Gabryjelski, Henry Paul c/o MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2017/52] |
Former [2005/47] | 01 /
Alkove, James M. c/o MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | ||
02 /
Gabryjelski, Henry Paul c/o MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/52] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/47] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05103664.8 | 03.05.2005 | [2005/47] | Priority number, date | US20040847516 | 17.05.2004 Original published format: US 847516 | [2005/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1598822 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1598822 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | [2006/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1598822 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/00 | [2005/47] | CPC: |
G06F21/10 (EP,US);
G06F17/00 (KR);
G11B20/00086 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/52] |
Former [2005/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Sichere Speicherung auf einem Aufzeichnungsmedium in einem Inhaltsschutzsystem | [2005/47] | English: | Secure storage on recordable medium in a content protection system | [2005/47] | French: | Stockage securisé sur un support d'enregistrement dans un système de protection de contenu | [2005/47] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/01] | 28.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.05.2005 | AT | 27.12.2017 | CY | 27.12.2017 | CZ | 27.12.2017 | DK | 27.12.2017 | EE | 27.12.2017 | ES | 27.12.2017 | FI | 27.12.2017 | IT | 27.12.2017 | LT | 27.12.2017 | MC | 27.12.2017 | NL | 27.12.2017 | PL | 27.12.2017 | PT | 27.12.2017 | RO | 27.12.2017 | SE | 27.12.2017 | SI | 27.12.2017 | SK | 27.12.2017 | TR | 27.12.2017 | BG | 27.03.2018 | GR | 28.03.2018 | IS | 27.04.2018 | GB | 03.05.2018 | IE | 03.05.2018 | LU | 03.05.2018 | BE | 31.05.2018 | CH | 31.05.2018 | FR | 31.05.2018 | LI | 31.05.2018 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/16] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
TR | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
GB | 03.05.2018 | ||
IE | 03.05.2018 | ||
LU | 03.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
FR | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
GB | 03.05.2018 | ||
IE | 03.05.2018 | ||
LU | 03.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
FR | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
GB | 03.05.2018 | ||
IE | 03.05.2018 | ||
LU | 03.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
IE | 03.05.2018 | ||
LU | 03.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
LU | 03.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/06] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
ES | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
LT | 27.12.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5513260 (RYAN JOHN O [US]) [A] 1-10,25-36,50-52 * column 5, line 22 - column 7, line 48; claim - *; | [AX]EP0878796 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-27,32,33,37-49 * page 3, line 16 - page 5, line 8 * * page 9, line 13 - page 19, line 26 * [X] 28-31,34-36,50-52; | [A]WO0178075 (GEN INSTRUMENT CORP [US], et al) [A] 11-24,37-49 * page 1, column 25 - page 2, column 2 * * page 2, line 28 - page 7, line 8 *; | [AX]WO0201335 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1-10,25-27,32,33 * page 1, line 24 - page 4, line 5; claim - * [X] 28-31,34-36,50-52; | [A]WO03007158 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,25,28,50 * abstract *; | [AX]EP1376308 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1-10,25-27,32,33 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0027]; figures 2-6; claim - * [X] 28-31,34-36,50-52; | [PA]US2004117309 (INOUE RYUJI [JP], et al) [PA] 1,25,28,50* abstract *; | [PA] - CHEN ET AL, APPLIED MATHEMATICS AND COMPUTATION, ELSEVIER, (20051015), vol. 169, no. 2, ISSN 0096-3003, pages 982 - 994, XP005098050 [PA] 11-24,37-49 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.amc.2004.11.004 | by applicant | US5513260 | US5715403 | EP0878796 | WO0059150 | WO0058811 | WO0152021 | WO0201335 | EP1376308 | - HONG, S. ET AL., "On the construction of a powerful distributed authentication server without additional key management", COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS, (2000), vol. 23, pages 1638 - 1644 | - "How two publishing houses maintain control of copyright", INFORMATION MANAGEMENT & TECHNOLOGY, (2001), vol. 34, no. 4, pages 168 - 169 | - JAKOBSSON, M. ET AL., "Proprietary certificates", TOPICS IN CRYPTOLOGY, (2002), pages 164 - 181 | - KUMIK, P., "Digital rights management", COMPUTERS AND LAW, (2000), vol. 11, no. 4, pages 14 - 15 | - TORRUBIA, A. ET AL., "Cryptography regulations for E-commerce and digital rights management", COMPUTERS & SECURITY, (2001), vol. 20, no. 8, pages 724 - 738 | - ZWOLLO, K., "Digital document delivery and digital rights management", INFORMATION SERVICES & USE, (2001), pages 9 - 11 | - GRISWOLD, G.N., "A method for protecting copyright on networks", IMA INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY PROJECT PROCEEDINGS, (1994), vol. 1, no. 1, pages 169 - 178 | - KAHN, R.E., "Deposit, registration and recordation in an electronic copyright management system", IMA INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY PROJECT PROCEEDINGS, (1994), vol. 1, no. 1, pages 111 - 120 | - EVANS, P., "DRM: Is the road to adoption fraught with potholes?", SEYBOLD REPORTING ANALYZING PUBLISHING TECHNOLOGIES, (2001), vol. 1, no. 14, page 32 | - FOWLER, T.B., "Technology's changing role in intellectual property rights", IT PROFESSIONAL (IEEE, (2002), vol. 4, no. 2, pages 39 - 44 | - GABLE, J., "The digital rights conundrum", TRANSFORM MAGAZINE, (2001), vol. 10, no. 11, page 27 | - GUNTER, C.A. ET AL., "Models and languages for digital rights", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 34TH ANNUAL HAWAII INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SYSTEM SCIENCES, (2001), pages 1 - 5 | - PEINADO, M., "Digital rights management in a multimedia environment", SMPTE JOURNAL, (2002), vol. 111, no. 3, pages 159 - 163 | - ROYAN, B., "Content creation and rights management: experiences of SCRAN (the Scottish Cultural Resources Access Network", PROGRAM, (2000), vol. 34, no. 2, pages 131 - 142 | - VALIMAKI, M. ET AL., "Digital rights management on open and semi-open networks", WIAPP, (2001), pages 154 - 155 | - YU, H., "Digital multimedia at home and content rights management", PROCEEDINGS 2002 IEEE 4TH INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON NETWORKED APPLIANCES, (2002), pages 49 - 56 | - HWANG, C. ET AL., "Protection of digital contents on distributed multimedia environment", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IASTED INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE, INTERNET AND MULTIMEDIA SYSTEMS AND APPLICATIONS, (20001119), pages 127 - 132 | - TRAMPUS, M. ET AL., "Using smart cards as a secure storage for digitally signed documents", IEEE REGION 8 EUROCON 2003: COMPUTER AS A TOOL, (2003), vol. 2, pages 74 - 78 | - UJVARI, T. ET AL., "A secure data storage system based on phase-encoded thin polarization holograms", JOURNAL OF OPTICS A-PURE AND APPLIED OPTICS, (2004), vol. 6, no. 4, pages 401 - 411 | - WRIGHT, T., "Secure digital archiving of high-value data", BT TECHNOLOGY JOURNAL, (2001), vol. 19, no. 3, pages 60 - 66 | US19990126614 | US20020185527 | US20020185511 |