EP1596244 - DISPLAY PANEL AND LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE HAVING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 17113, 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2015/40] |
Former [2012/45] | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 95, Samsung 2 Ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-City, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | ||
Former [2012/39] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | ||
Former [2005/46] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Eung-Sang 101-203 Hyundai Apt., Bokdae-dong, Heungdeok-gu Cheongju-shi, Chungcheonfbuk-do / KR | 02 /
Lee, Ho-Jung Byeokjeokgol 8-danji Hansin Apt. 813-805, Yeongto Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Hirai, Akira Areummaeul Poonglim Apt. 502-1102, Imae-dong, Bun Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Kim, Bong-Ju Byeokjeok-gol Apt. 911-1101, Yeongtong-dong, Yeon Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Jeon, Yong-Je 301, 1016-2, Yeongtong-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 06 /
Park, Sang-Woo Gangbyeon Samsung Apt. 102-2101, 178, Wonhyoro 4- Seoul / KR | [2005/49] |
Former [2005/46] | 01 /
LEE, Eung-Sang Woosung Apt. 102-1402, Yangjae 1-dong, Seocho-gu Seoul / KR | ||
02 /
LEE, Ho-Jung Byeokjeokgol 8-danji Hansin Apt. 813-805, Yeongto Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
03 /
HIRAI, Akira Areummaeul Poonglim Apt. 502-1102, Imae-dong, Bun Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
04 /
KIM, Bong-Ju Byeokjeok-gol Apt. 911-1101, Yeongtong-dong, Yeon Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
05 /
JEON, Yong-Je 301, 1016-2, Yeongtong-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
06 /
PARK, Sang-Woo Gangbyeon Samsung Apt. 102-2101, 178, Wonhyoro 4- Seoul / KR | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/46] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05103891.7 | 10.05.2005 | [2005/46] | Priority number, date | KR20040088309 | 02.11.2004 Original published format: KR 2004088309 | KR20040032643 | 10.05.2004 Original published format: KR 2004032643 | [2005/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1596244 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1596244 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | [2006/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1335, G02F1/1333, G02F1/1343 | [2005/46] | CPC: |
G02F1/133555 (EP,US);
G02F1/133345 (EP,US);
G02F1/133514 (EP,US);
G02F1/136227 (EP,US);
G02F1/133553 (EP,US);
G02F1/13356 (EP,US);
G02F2201/121 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | FR, IT [2006/49] |
Former [2005/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Anzeigetafel und Flüssigkristallanzeigegerät mit dieser Anzeigetafel | [2005/46] | English: | DISPLAY PANEL AND LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE HAVING THE SAME | [2005/46] | French: | Panneau d'affichage et dispositif d'affichage à cristaux liquides comportant ce panneau | [2005/46] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/29] | 21.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/37] | 08.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.02.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 21.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2019 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2002149722 (ANNO KOUICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 9,10,12 * paragraph [0135]; figure 4F *[A] 11; | [XYA]US2002176029 (FUJINO MASAHIRO [JP]) [X] 17-25 * figures 1-4,12 * * idem * [Y] 9,10,12 [A] 1; | [XA]US2003160914 (HA KYOUNG-SU [KR]) [X] 4,5 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0058]; figure 7d * [A] 1,11; | [XA] - KUBO M ET AL, "Development of Advanced TFT-LCD with good legibility under any ambient light intensity", JOURNAL OF THE SOCIETY FOR INFORMATION DISPLAY, SOCIETY FOR INFORMATION DISPLAY, SAN JOSE, US, (2000), vol. 8, no. 4, ISSN 1071-0922, pages 299 - 304, XP002240612 [X] 17-25 * figure 2 * [A] 1 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1889/1.1828767 | Examination | JP2004271723 | US2004201804 |