EP1601027 - Semiconductor light emitting device including photonic band gap material and luminescent material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/48] | Semiconductor light emitting device including photonic band cap material and luminescent material | ||
[2012/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philips Lumileds Lighting Company LLC 370 West Trimble Road San Jose CA 95131 / US | [2008/04] |
Former [2005/48] | For all designated states Lumileds Lighting U.S., LLC 370 West Trimble Road San Jose California 95131 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stockman, Stephen, A., c/o Lumileds Lighting, U.S. 370 West Trimble Road San Jose, California 95131 / US | [2005/48] | Representative(s) | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/26] | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2005/48] | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 05103943.6 | 11.05.2005 | [2005/48] | Priority number, date | US20040855292 | 26.05.2004 Original published format: US 855292 | [2005/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1601027 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1601027 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | [2011/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1601027 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/50, // H01L33/44 | [2011/25] | CPC: |
H01L33/50 (EP,US);
H01L2933/0083 (EP,US);
H01L33/44 (EP,US);
H01L33/504 (EP,US);
H01L33/508 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/48] | H01L33/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/10] |
Former [2012/09] | DE | ||
Former [2005/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Lichtemittierendes Halbleiterbauelement mit photonischem Bandlückenmaterial und Lumineszenzmaterial | [2012/22] | English: | Semiconductor light emitting device including photonic band gap material and luminescent material | [2012/22] | French: | Dispositif semiconducteur émetteur de lumière comprenant un matériau à bande interdite photonique et un matériau luminescent | [2012/22] |
Former [2005/48] | Lichtemittierendes Halbleiterbauelement mit photonischerm Bandlückenmaterial und Leuchtstoff | ||
Former [2005/48] | Semiconductor light emitting device including photonic band cap material and luminescent material | ||
Former [2005/48] | Dispositf semiconducteur émetteur de lumière comprenant un matériau à largeur de bande interdite photonique et un matériau luminescent | Examination procedure | 22.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 26.01.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/44] | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Designated contracting state(s) TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NL, MC, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 31.01.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 31.01.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.02.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.05.2005 | AT | 21.11.2012 | BE | 21.11.2012 | BG | 21.11.2012 | CY | 21.11.2012 | CZ | 21.11.2012 | DK | 21.11.2012 | EE | 21.11.2012 | FI | 21.11.2012 | IS | 21.11.2012 | IT | 21.11.2012 | LT | 21.11.2012 | MC | 21.11.2012 | NL | 21.11.2012 | PL | 21.11.2012 | RO | 21.11.2012 | SE | 21.11.2012 | SI | 21.11.2012 | SK | 21.11.2012 | TR | 21.11.2012 | GR | 22.02.2013 | ES | 04.03.2013 | PT | 21.03.2013 | IE | 11.05.2013 | LU | 11.05.2013 | CH | 31.05.2013 | LI | 31.05.2013 | [2016/33] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 11.05.2005 | |
AT | 21.11.2012 | ||
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.11.2012 | ||
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
TR | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
IE | 11.05.2013 | ||
LU | 11.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
TR | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
IE | 11.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
IE | 11.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
IE | 11.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 21.11.2012 | |
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/27] | BE | 21.11.2012 | |
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 21.11.2012 | |
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 21.11.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US5813752 (SINGER BARRY [US], et al) [AD] 1-6,16-25 * column 1, line 37 - column 2, line 4 * * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 56; figure 1; claims 1,5 *; | [A]US5813753 (VRIENS LEENDERT [NL], et al) [A] 1-4,16-24 * column 5, lines 42-45 * * column 6, lines 37-52; figure 4 *; | [A]US6130780 (JOANNOPOULOS JOHN D [US], et al) [A] 14 * column 1, lines 13-40 * * column 2, line 25 - column 7, line 14; figures 1-6 *; | [AD]US6155699 (MILLER JEFFREY N [US], et al) [AD] 1-4,6,7,16-20,26-29 * column 1, line 38 - column 3, line 15; figures 2-6 *; | [A]WO0169692 (LUMILEDS LIGHTING BV [NL]) [A] 1-4,18,25* page 3, line 18 - page 4, line 3; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1387413 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3,5,9,10 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] , [0026] - [0028] - [0030] , [0031]; figures 8A-B, 9,10,13-17 *; | [A] - SHANHUI FAN ET AL, "Rate-Equation Analysis of Output Efficiency and Modulation Rate of Photonic-Crystal Light-Emitting Diodes", IEEE JOURNAL OF QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20001001), vol. 36, no. 10, ISSN 0018-9197, XP011052497 [A] 1,5,12-14,27 * abstract * * page 1123, column 1, lines 1-6, 9-19; figures 4,8 * * page 1129, column 2, line 1 - page 1130, column 1, line 2; figure 12 * | [A] - GATES BYRON ET AL, "Photonic band-gap properties of opaline lattices of spherical colloids doped with various concentrations of smaller colloids", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, US, (20010521), vol. 78, no. 21, doi:10.1063/1.1374229, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 3178 - 3180, XP012028070 [A] 10,11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1374229 |