EP1726389 - Machine tool with mobile barrel for the truncating manufacture of pieces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TORNOS S.A. 111, rue Industrielle 2740 Moutier / CH | [2006/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paroz, Cédric Bas de la Sauce 64 2732 Saicourt / CH | [2006/48] | Representative(s) | BOVARD AG Ingénieurs-Conseils Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/48] | BOVARD AG Ingénieurs-Conseils, Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | Application number, filing date | 05104519.3 | 26.05.2005 | [2006/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1726389 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1726389 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B23B7/02, B23B7/06 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
B23B7/06 (EP);
B23B7/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, IT, LI [2007/31] |
Former [2006/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Werkzeugmaschine mit mobiler Führungsbuchse für die Herstellung von Teilen durch Abstechen | [2006/48] | English: | Machine tool with mobile barrel for the truncating manufacture of pieces | [2006/48] | French: | Machine-outil avec canon mobile pour la réalisation de pièces par décolletage | [2006/48] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/21] | 14.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1552410 (PRONTOR WERK GAUTHIER GMBH) [A] 1-3 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US6189424 (WHEELING WILLIAM GEORGE [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE20215705U (PROCON MASCHINEN GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1* figure 2 * |