EP1605530 - Glass lid and package provided with such a lid for the encapsulation of electronic components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/50] | Glass lid, and package provided with a such a lid, for the encapsulation of electronic components | ||
[2011/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2012/10] |
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BETTINELLI, ARMAND SBU TECHNOLOGY-BU CORPORATE RESEARCH & TECHNOLOGY 87 Impasse Jardins des Berards 38500, Coublevie / FR | [2011/45] |
Former [2005/50] | 01 /
BETTINELLI, ARMAND SBU TECHNOLOGY-BU CORPORATE RESEARCH & TECHNOLOGY 38500, Coublevie / FR | Representative(s) | Browaeys, Jean-Philippe TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | Browaeys, Jean-Philippe Technicolor 1-5 rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | ||
Former [N/P] | Browaeys, Jean-Philippe Thomson 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2005/50] | Browaeys, Jean-Philippe Thomson, Patents, 46, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 05104596.1 | 30.05.2005 | [2005/50] | Priority number, date | FR20040051149 | 09.06.2004 Original published format: FR 0451149 | [2005/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1605530 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1605530 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | [2010/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1605530 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/04, H01L51/10 | [2010/51] | CPC: |
H05B33/04 (EP,US);
H01L23/12 (KR);
H10K50/841 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/50] | H01L51/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2011/35] |
Former [2005/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Glasabdeckung und Verpackung enthaltend eine solche Abdeckung zur Verkapselung elektronischer Bauteile | [2011/44] | English: | Glass lid and package provided with such a lid for the encapsulation of electronic components | [2011/44] | French: | Capot en verre et boîtier d'encapsulation de composants électroniques doté d'un tel capot | [2011/45] |
Former [2005/50] | Glasabdeckung und Verpackung, enthaltend eine solche Abdeckung zur Verkapselung elektronischer Bauteile | ||
Former [2005/50] | Glass lid, and package provided with a such a lid, for the encapsulation of electronic components | ||
Former [2005/50] | Capot en verre et boitier d'encapsulation de composants électroniques doté d'un tel capot | Examination procedure | 24.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/26] | 24.06.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.08.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6470594 (BOROSON MICHAEL L [US], et al) [A] 1-11* claims 1-7 *; | [A]US2003066311 (LI CHIEN-HSING [TW], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0024]; figure 2 *; | [A]US2003230976 (NISHIKAWA RYUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0015]; figure 1 *; | [AD]EP1411562 (THOMSON LICENSING SA [FR]) [AD] 1-11 * figure 9 * |