EP1731823 - Cryogenic transfer hose [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Single Buoy Moorings Inc. 5, Route de Fribourg 1723 Marly / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/50] | For all designated states SINGLE BUOY MOORINGS INC. 5, Route de Fribourg CH-1723 Marly / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Queau, Jean-Pierre 15 Rue Deloye 06000 Nice / FR | 02 /
Pollack, Jack 14855 Memorial Drive 2112 Houston, TX 77079 / US | 03 /
Wille, Hein 9 Rue Montée Saint Michel 06360 Eze Village / FR | 04 /
van Dijk, Liselotte 45 avenue Louis Laurens A17 06190 Roquebrune Cap Martin / FR | [2006/50] | Representative(s) | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/50] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 05105011.0 | 08.06.2005 | [2006/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1731823 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16L39/02, F16L59/14, F16L11/20 | [2006/50] | CPC: |
F16L59/143 (EP,US);
F16L39/005 (EP,US);
F16L39/02 (EP,US);
Y10S285/904 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/34] |
Former [2006/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schlauch zum Befördern von kryogenen Fluiden | [2006/50] | English: | Cryogenic transfer hose | [2006/50] | French: | Tuyau flexible pour le transport de fluides cryogéniques | [2006/50] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/10] | 16.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US3809128 (TATEISI T, et al) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [X]DE2705361 (PFORZHEIM METALLSCHLAUCH) [X] 1,4,6-9,12,13 * page 12, line 1 - page 15, line 8; figures 2,6 *; | [Y]US4108476 (KRUPP WALTER H) [Y] 1,6,8,9 * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 11; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US4111466 (DEREGIBUS ALFIO D A) [X] 1,6,8-10 * column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 6; figure 1 *; | [A]US4315408 (KARL ROBERT D) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [DA]US4417603 (ARGY GILLES [FR]) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE4031879 (KERNFORSCHUNGSZ KARLSRUHE [DE]) [A] 1,3,4 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0949444 (SEMPERIT AG [AT]) [Y] 1,6,8,9 * abstract *; | [DA]WO0196772 (BHP PETROLEUM PTY LTD [AU], et al) [DA] 1* abstract *; | [A]US6682102 (BETZ JAMES C [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * |