EP1607244 - Device for adjusting the tire pressure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, LU, TR | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/51] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY One John Deere Place Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nordhoff, Hendrik Schonebeck 29 48329 Havixbeck / DE | [2005/51] | Representative(s) | Holst, Sönke, et al John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/51] | Holst, Sönke, et al Deere & Company, European Office, Patent Department Steubenstrasse 36-42 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 05105208.2 | 14.06.2005 | [2005/51] | Priority number, date | DE20041029736 | 19.06.2004 Original published format: DE102004029736 | [2005/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1607244 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1607244 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60C23/00 | [2005/51] | CPC: |
B60C23/00318 (EP,US);
B60C17/02 (EP,US);
B60C5/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/51] | Title | German: | Reifendruckeinstellanlage | [2005/51] | English: | Device for adjusting the tire pressure | [2005/51] | French: | Dispositif de réglage d'une pression d'un pneu | [2005/51] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/31] | 30.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.02.2007 | CZ | 28.02.2007 | IT | 28.02.2007 | PL | 28.02.2007 | RO | 28.02.2007 | SI | 28.02.2007 | SK | 28.02.2007 | TR | 28.02.2007 | BG | 28.05.2007 | GR | 29.05.2007 | ES | 08.06.2007 | AT | 14.06.2007 | LU | 14.06.2007 | IS | 28.06.2007 | MC | 30.06.2007 | PT | 30.07.2007 | HU | 01.09.2007 | [2009/45] |
Former [2008/39] | CZ | 28.02.2007 | |
IT | 28.02.2007 | ||
PL | 28.02.2007 | ||
RO | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 28.05.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
AT | 14.06.2007 | ||
IS | 28.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 28.02.2007 | |
IT | 28.02.2007 | ||
PL | 28.02.2007 | ||
RO | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 28.05.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
IS | 28.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/12] | CZ | 28.02.2007 | |
PL | 28.02.2007 | ||
RO | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 28.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
IS | 28.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/05] | CZ | 28.02.2007 | |
PL | 28.02.2007 | ||
RO | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 28.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
IS | 28.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | CZ | 28.02.2007 | |
PL | 28.02.2007 | ||
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 28.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
IS | 28.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/52] | PL | 28.02.2007 | |
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 28.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
IS | 28.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/44] | PL | 28.02.2007 | |
SI | 28.02.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
IS | 28.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB663265 (DUNLOP RUBBER CO, et al) [A] 1-10* page 1, line 80 - line 83; figure - *; | [A]GB1550537 (TSURUTA Y) [A] 1-10 * page 1 - page 3; figure -; claim - * |