EP1609688 - Liquid Dispenser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MM Petro sp. z o.o. ul. Spoldzielcza 1 44-240 Zory / PL | [2005/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lewicki, Zenon ul. Powstania Listopadowego 30 63-400, Ostrów Wlkp / PL | 02 /
Zybala, Jerzy ul. Stasica 8a/4 63-400, Ostrów Wlkp / PL | 03 /
Cieslak, Marian ul. Obrzee 3 63-400, Ostrów Wlkp / PL | [2005/52] | Representative(s) | Korga, Leokadia Kancelaria Rzecznika Patentowego ul. Bereniki 6/7 44-117 Gliwice / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/52] | Korga, Leokadia Kancelaria Rzecznika Patentowego ul. Bereniki 6/7 44-117 Gliwice / PL | Application number, filing date | 05105279.3 | 15.06.2005 | [2005/52] | Priority number, date | PL20040368772 | 25.06.2004 Original published format: PL 36877204 | [2005/52] | Filing language | PL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1609688 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1609688 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | [2007/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/50, B60S5/02, B67D5/01, B67D5/02 | [2005/52] | CPC: |
B60S1/50 (EP);
B60S5/02 (EP);
B67D7/02 (EP);
B67D7/0266 (EP);
B67D7/763 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/52] | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitsspender | [2005/52] | English: | Liquid Dispenser | [2005/52] | French: | Distributeur de liquide | [2005/52] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 17.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/25] | 04.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.08.2007 | 30.06.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1065113 (TATSUNO CORP [JP]) [A] 1* paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0020]; figure 2 *; | [DA]PL340512 (MICHNA JANUSZ [PL]) [DA] 1 * the whole document * |