EP1606989 - Harvesting machine for tuft vegetables [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Piva, Tiziano Via Fabbrica, 44 35020 Arre (PD) / IT | For all designated states Piva, Alberto Via Fabbrica, 44 35020 Arre (PD) / IT | For all designated states Gallo, Nicola Via Liston, 55 35020 Candiana (PD) / IT | For all designated states Gallo, Emanuela Via Domenico Martinati, 31 35020 Candiana (PD) / IT | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/44] | For all designated states Piva, Tiziano Via Fabbrica, 44 35020 Arre (PD) / IT | ||
For all designated states Piva, Alberto Via Fabbrica, 44 35020 Arre (PD) / IT | |||
For all designated states Gallo, Nicola Via Viona, 29 35020 Candiana (PD) / IT | |||
For all designated states Gallo, Emanuela Via Domenico Martinati, 31 35020 Candiana (PD) / IT | |||
Former [2005/51] | For all designated states Piva, Tiziano Via Fabricca, 44 35020 ARRE (PD) / IT | ||
For all designated states Piva, Alberto Via Fabricca, 44 35020 ARRE (PD) / IT | |||
For all designated states Gallo, Nicola Via Viona, 29 35020 CANDIANA (PD) / IT | |||
For all designated states Gallo, Emanuela Via Domenico Martinati, 31 35020 CANDIANA (PD) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/51] | Representative(s) | Bonini, Ercole, et al Studio Bonini Srl Corso Fogazzaro, 8 36100 Vicenza / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/51] | Bonini, Ercole, et al Studio Bonini srl Corso Fogazzaro 8 36100 Vicenza / IT | Application number, filing date | 05105305.6 | 16.06.2005 | [2005/51] | Priority number, date | IT2004VI00148 | 17.06.2004 Original published format: IT VI20040148 | [2005/51] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1606989 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1606989 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A01D45/26, A01D45/28 | [2005/51] | CPC: |
A01D45/26 (EP);
A01D45/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/51] | Title | German: | Erntemaschine für Gemüse mit Büschel | [2005/51] | English: | Harvesting machine for tuft vegetables | [2005/51] | French: | Machine de récolte de légumes à feuilles en bouquet | [2007/18] |
Former [2005/51] | Machine de récolte de légumes à touffe de feuilles | Examination procedure | 31.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 18.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.10.2007 | CH | 31.10.2007 | CY | 31.10.2007 | CZ | 31.10.2007 | DK | 31.10.2007 | EE | 31.10.2007 | FI | 31.10.2007 | LI | 31.10.2007 | LT | 31.10.2007 | PL | 31.10.2007 | RO | 31.10.2007 | SI | 31.10.2007 | SK | 31.10.2007 | TR | 31.10.2007 | BG | 31.01.2008 | SE | 31.01.2008 | GR | 01.02.2008 | IS | 29.02.2008 | PT | 31.03.2008 | HU | 01.05.2008 | IE | 16.06.2008 | LU | 16.06.2008 | MC | 30.06.2008 | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/33] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
CY | 31.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
EE | 31.10.2007 | ||
FI | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
LT | 31.10.2007 | ||
PL | 31.10.2007 | ||
RO | 31.10.2007 | ||
SI | 31.10.2007 | ||
SK | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
GR | 01.02.2008 | ||
IS | 29.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
IE | 16.06.2008 | ||
LU | 16.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/45] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
CY | 31.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
EE | 31.10.2007 | ||
FI | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
LT | 31.10.2007 | ||
PL | 31.10.2007 | ||
RO | 31.10.2007 | ||
SI | 31.10.2007 | ||
SK | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
GR | 01.02.2008 | ||
IS | 29.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
IE | 16.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
EE | 31.10.2007 | ||
FI | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
LT | 31.10.2007 | ||
PL | 31.10.2007 | ||
RO | 31.10.2007 | ||
SI | 31.10.2007 | ||
SK | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
GR | 01.02.2008 | ||
IS | 29.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
IE | 16.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
EE | 31.10.2007 | ||
FI | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
LT | 31.10.2007 | ||
PL | 31.10.2007 | ||
RO | 31.10.2007 | ||
SI | 31.10.2007 | ||
SK | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
GR | 01.02.2008 | ||
IS | 29.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
FI | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
LT | 31.10.2007 | ||
PL | 31.10.2007 | ||
RO | 31.10.2007 | ||
SI | 31.10.2007 | ||
SK | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
GR | 01.02.2008 | ||
IS | 29.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
LT | 31.10.2007 | ||
PL | 31.10.2007 | ||
RO | 31.10.2007 | ||
SI | 31.10.2007 | ||
SK | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
IS | 29.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
LT | 31.10.2007 | ||
PL | 31.10.2007 | ||
RO | 31.10.2007 | ||
SI | 31.10.2007 | ||
SK | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
IS | 29.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2007 | ||
DK | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
LT | 31.10.2007 | ||
PL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SI | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
IS | 29.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 31.10.2007 | |
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
LT | 31.10.2007 | ||
PL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SI | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
IS | 29.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | CH | 31.10.2007 | |
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
LT | 31.10.2007 | ||
PL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SI | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
IS | 29.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 31.10.2007 | |
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
LT | 31.10.2007 | ||
PL | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 31.01.2008 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
IS | 29.02.2008 | ||
PT | 31.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1403361 (POUTSMA T) [A] 1* page 3, column 2, line 94 - line 119; figures 2,7 *; | [A]US5846129 (DRAGT STEVE [US]) [A] 1 * column 7, line 25 - line 39 * * column 9, line 33 - line 45; figures 1-5 *; | [A]WO9909804 (PROCORDIA FOOD AB [SE], et al) [A] 1 * page 4, line 3 - line 12; figure 3 *; | [AP]US6820404 (SCHWAB JEROME A [US]) [AP] 1 * column 5, line 4 - line 19; figures 1,2 * |