EP1610389 - Thin film transistor array substrate, display using the same, and fabrication method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 95, Samsung 2 Ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-City, Gyeonggi-Do, 446-711 / KR | [2012/40] |
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states Samsung Mobile Display Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
Former [2005/52] | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Choi, Woong Sik, @Legal & IP Team, Samsung SDI Co. Ltd. 428-5, Gongse-ri, Kiheung-eup, Yongin Kyunggi-do / KR | [2014/26] |
Former [2005/52] | 01 /
Choi, Woong Sik, Legal & IP Team, Samsung SDI Co. Ltd., 428-5, Gongse-ri, Kiheung-eup, Yongin Kyunggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2014/19] |
Former [2008/43] | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen, et al Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2005/52] | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen, et al Anwaltskanzlei Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 05105583.8 | 23.06.2005 | [2005/52] | Priority number, date | KR20040047887 | 24.06.2004 Original published format: KR 2004047887 | [2005/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1610389 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1610389 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | [2006/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1610389 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/32, H01L51/52, H01L27/15, H01L27/12, G02F1/1345, // G02F1/1362 | [2014/03] | CPC: |
G02F1/13458 (EP,US);
G02F1/1345 (KR);
H10K59/88 (EP,US);
H01L27/12 (EP,US);
H01L27/156 (EP,US);
H10K50/844 (US);
H10K59/12 (US);
H10K59/131 (EP,KR,US);
H10K71/70 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2013/51] | H01L27/32, H01L51/52, H01L27/15, H01L27/12, G02F1/1362, G02F1/1345 | ||
Former IPC [2005/52] | H01L27/15, H01L27/12, G02F1/133 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/52] | Title | German: | Dünnschichttransistormatrixsubstrat, Anzeigevorrichtung mit dem Substrat und Verfahren zu deren Herstelllung | [2014/04] | English: | Thin film transistor array substrate, display using the same, and fabrication method thereof | [2005/52] | French: | Substrat avec réseau de transistors à couches minces, dispositif d'affichage avec le substrat et méthode pour sa fabrication | [2014/03] |
Former [2005/52] | Dünnschichttransistormatrixsubstrat, Anzeigevorrichtung damit und Verfahren zu dessen Herstelllung | ||
Former [2005/52] | Substrat à réseau de transistors à couches minces, dispositif d'affichage avec le substrat et méthode pour sa fabrication | Examination procedure | 18.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/52] | 04.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.01.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.04.2008 | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.06.2005 | AT | 25.06.2014 | BE | 25.06.2014 | CY | 25.06.2014 | CZ | 25.06.2014 | DK | 25.06.2014 | EE | 25.06.2014 | ES | 25.06.2014 | FI | 25.06.2014 | IT | 25.06.2014 | LT | 25.06.2014 | MC | 25.06.2014 | NL | 25.06.2014 | PL | 25.06.2014 | RO | 25.06.2014 | SE | 25.06.2014 | SI | 25.06.2014 | SK | 25.06.2014 | TR | 25.06.2014 | GR | 26.09.2014 | IS | 25.10.2014 | PT | 27.10.2014 | [2017/40] |
Former [2016/09] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 25.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2001176657 ; | [Y]US4951098 (ALBERGO CHRISTOPHER J [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * column 1, line 15 - column 2, line 33 * * column 2, line 47 - column 4, line 40 * * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US6359342 (YUAN PAO-HO [TW], et al) [Y] 1-18 * abstract ** column 1, line 14 - column 4, line 68; figures 3,4 *; | [Y]US6437596 (JENKINS LESLIE CHARLES [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * column 1, line 10 - line 40 * * column 2, line 37 - column 7, line 63 * * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US2004000865 (YAMAZAKI SHUNPEI [JP]) [Y] 1-18 * figures 11,12 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010210), vol. 2000, no. 23, & JP2001176657 A 20010629 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [Y] 1-18 * abstract * | Examination | US2003228715 |