EP1615187 - Personal safety device detecting its removal from a wearer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.04.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 13.05.2020 [2020/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vivago Oy Itsehallintokuja 4 02600 Espoo / FI | [2015/32] |
Former [2006/02] | For all designated states IST International Security Technology OY Melkonkatu 16 A 00210 Helsinki / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Särelä, Antti Muolaantie 26 B 02140, Espoo / FI | 02 /
Myllymäki, Marko Niittykulmantie 5 as 10 00440, Helsinki / FI | [2006/02] | Representative(s) | LEITZINGER OY Tammasaarenkatu 1 00180 Helsinki / FI | [2006/02] | Application number, filing date | 05105609.1 | 23.06.2005 | [2006/02] | Priority number, date | FI20040005266 | 06.07.2004 Original published format: FI 20045266 | [2006/02] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1615187 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G08B25/01, G06F19/00, A61B5/00 | [2006/02] | CPC: |
H04M11/04 (EP,US);
A61B5/002 (EP,US);
A61B5/0022 (EP,US);
A61B5/681 (EP,US);
G08B21/0211 (EP,US);
G08B21/0286 (EP,US);
G08B21/0288 (EP,US);
G08B25/016 (EP,US);
G16H40/67 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/02] | Title | German: | Persönliches Sicherheitsgerät welches das Entfernen vom Träger detektiert | [2006/02] | English: | Personal safety device detecting its removal from a wearer | [2006/02] | French: | Dispositif de securité personnel sur un porteur détectant son enlèvement | [2006/02] | Examination procedure | 11.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 19.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/20] | 04.05.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.03.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/20] | Appeal following examination | 25.06.2015 | Appeal received No. T1780/15 | 26.08.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.11.2019 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2019/46] | 06.03.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.06.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05327595 ; | [A]US4736196 (MCMAHON WALTER W [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5982285 (BUECHE KENNETH M [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 1, lines 16-18,45-65 * * column 3, lines 5-14,50-52 * * column 4, lines 1-12 * * figures 1,3 *; | [X]US6072392 (HENDERSON HERBERT JEFFERSON [US], et al) [X] 1,4,7,8 * abstract * * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 47 * * column 3, lines 1-5 * * column 7, lines 27-50 * * figures 1,7,15-17,21-23 *; | [A]US2002013717 (ANDO MASAHIRO [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]US2003069714 (WIGLEY FREDRICK M [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,9-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0007] - [0009] - [0017] , [0023] , [0026] * * figures 1-4 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940311), vol. 018, no. 148, Database accession no. (E - 1522), & JP05327595 A 19931210 (NEC CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | US6072392 | - PORTEUS J.; BROWNSELL S., "Exploring technologies for independent living for older people", ANCHOR TRUST, (2000), page 60 |