EP1596227 - System and method for fabricating arrayed optical fiber collimators [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Osaki Electric Co., Ltd. 2-7 Higashigotanda 2-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/46] | For all designated states Osaki Electric Co., Ltd. 2-7 Higashigotanda 2-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kikuchi, Juro 1156-2, Arata Uenohara-machi Kitasuru-gun Yamanashi 409-113 / JP | 02 /
Mizushima, Yasuyuki 700-2 Sonogaya Kakegawa-city Shizuoka 436-0083 / JP | 03 /
Takahashi, Hiroki 1340-8 Fukuroi City Fukuroi Shizuoka 437-0032 / JP | 04 /
Takeuchi, Yoshiaki 3-7-17-705, Higashi Niiza-shi Saitama 352-0002 / JP | [2005/47] | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma Notarbartolo & Gervasi GmbH Bavariaring 21 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/46] | Gervasi, Gemma Notarbartolo & Gervasi GmbH, Bavariaring 21 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05106270.1 | 29.04.2002 | [2005/46] | Priority number, date | US20010898622 | 03.07.2001 Original published format: US 898622 | [2005/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1596227 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/30, G02B6/00, G02B6/32, G02B6/38, H01S3/00, H01S3/30 | [2005/46] | CPC: |
G02B27/62 (EP,US);
G02B6/32 (EP,US);
G02B6/4225 (EP,US);
G02B6/4249 (EP,US);
G02B6/4204 (EP,US);
G02B6/4226 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2005/46] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Herstellung von faseroptischen Kollimatoren in einer Linearanordnung | [2005/46] | English: | System and method for fabricating arrayed optical fiber collimators | [2005/46] | French: | Système et procédé de fabrication de collimateurs à fibres optiques en réseau | [2005/46] | Examination procedure | 05.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/46] | 21.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/17] | 05.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/17] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02739202.6 / EP1405111 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0619505 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * column 7, line 4 - line 24 * * column 1, line 50 - line 57 ** column 5, line 23 - column 6, line 22; figures 3-6 *; | [A]EP0695961 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * column 4, line 31 - line 42; claim 1 *; | [Y]US5815626 (KUBA KAZUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2 * column 21, line 24 - column 22, line 36; figure 10 * * column 20, line 48 - line 51 *; | [Y] - HAN H ET AL, "INTEGRATION OF SILICON BENCH WITH MICRO OPTICS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, US, (199901), vol. 3631, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 234 - 243, XP000995170 [Y] 1,2 * page 240 - page 241; figures 4,11,13 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.348318 |