Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4215635B | Global Dossier | 28.01.2009 | B2 | JP2005508015 | 24.03.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US0213582 | 29.04.2002 | US89862201 | 03.07.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1405111 | Global Dossier | 23.08.2006 | B1 | EP1405111 | 06.10.2004 | A4 | EP1405111 | 07.04.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0213582 | 29.04.2002 | US89862201 | 03.07.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1596227 | Global Dossier | 16.11.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02739202 | 29.04.2002 | US89862201 | 03.07.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2448945 | 28.09.2010 | C | CA2448945 | 16.01.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0213582 | 29.04.2002 | US89862201 | 03.07.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60214186T | 26.07.2007 | T2 | DE60214186D1 | 05.10.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US0213582 | 29.04.2002 | US89862201 | 03.07.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03005078 | Global Dossier | 16.01.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89862201 | 03.07.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE337569T | 15.09.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US89862201 | 03.07.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100478721C | 15.04.2009 | C | CN1967303 | 23.05.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US89862201 | 03.07.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1518672 | 04.08.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US89862201 | 03.07.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6404955 | 11.06.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US89862201 | 03.07.2001 | Type | Earlier application | EP1405111 |