EP1602369 - Bupropion Metabolites for treating anxiety [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/49] | Bupropion Metabolites and Methods of their Synthesis and Use | ||
[2009/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEPRACOR, INC. 84 Waterford Drive Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | [2010/14] |
Former [2005/49] | For all designated states SEPRACOR, INC. 84 waterford Drive Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fang, Qun, K 35 Atwood Street 02181, Wellesley / US | 02 /
Senanayake, Chrisantha, H 12 Isabel's Way Brookfield, CT 06804 / US | 03 /
Grover, Paul 4 Warwick Road 02038, Franklin / US | [2006/13] |
Former [2005/49] | 01 /
Fang, Qun, K 35 Atwood Street 02181, Wellesley / US | ||
02 /
Senanayake, Chrisantha, H 11 Old Farm Circle 01545, Shrewsbury / US | |||
03 /
Grover, Paul 4 Warwick Road 02038, Franklin / US | Representative(s) | Killin, Stephen James, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/49] | Killin, Stephen James, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 05106426.9 | 23.08.2000 | [2005/49] | Priority number, date | US20000510241 | 22.02.2000 Original published format: US 510241 | US20000640725 | 18.08.2000 Original published format: US 640725 | [2005/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1602369 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1602369 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | [2007/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1602369 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/5375, A61K31/137, A61P25/24, A61P25/34, A61P25/20 | [2006/47] | CPC: |
A61K31/537 (EP,US);
A61K31/5375 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/135 (EP,US);
A61K31/137 (EP,US);
A61K31/165 (EP,US);
A61K31/415 (EP,US);
A61K31/43 (EP,US);
A61K31/435 (EP,US);
A61K31/46 (EP,US);
A61K31/465 (EP,US);
A61K31/50 (EP,US);
A61K31/53 (EP,US);
A61K31/535 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P1/08 (EP);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/34 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07C213/00 (EP,US);
C07C215/30 (EP,US);
C07C225/16 (EP,US);
C07C45/511 (EP,US);
C07C45/63 (EP,US);
C07C49/84 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/135, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/137, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/165, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/415, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/435, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/43, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/465, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/46, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/50, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/535, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/5375, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/53, A61K2300/00 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2005/49] | A61K31/137, A61P25/24, A61P25/34, A61P25/20, A61K31/5375 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2005/49] | Extension states | AL | 13.07.2005 | LT | 13.07.2005 | MK | 13.07.2005 | RO | 13.07.2005 | SI | 13.07.2005 | Title | German: | Bupropion Metaboliten zur Behandlung von Angstzuständen | [2010/14] | English: | Bupropion Metabolites for treating anxiety | [2009/22] | French: | Métabolites du bupropione pour traiter l'anxiété | [2009/22] |
Former [2005/49] | Bupropion Metaboliten und Verfahren zu ihrer Synthese und Behandlung | ||
Former [2005/49] | Bupropion Metabolites and Methods of their Synthesis and Use | ||
Former [2005/49] | Métabolites du bupropione et méthodes pour leur synthèse et utilisation | Examination procedure | 13.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/49] | 08.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 27.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00957684.4 / EP1259243 | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/11] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 27.01.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 27.01.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.02.2010 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 20.11.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 20.11.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.12.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.04.2010 | BE | 07.04.2010 | DK | 07.04.2010 | FI | 07.04.2010 | IT | 07.04.2010 | SE | 07.04.2010 | CY | 21.04.2010 | GR | 08.07.2010 | ES | 18.07.2010 | PT | 09.08.2010 | IE | 23.08.2010 | LU | 23.08.2010 | MC | 31.08.2010 | [2012/44] |
Former [2011/36] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
BE | 07.04.2010 | ||
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
IT | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
IE | 23.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
BE | 07.04.2010 | ||
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
IT | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
PT | 09.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
DK | 07.04.2010 | ||
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
CY | 21.04.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
GR | 08.07.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 07.04.2010 | |
FI | 07.04.2010 | ||
SE | 07.04.2010 | ||
ES | 18.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | ES | 18.07.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9937305 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,7-9,12,19,20,22-30 * page 1, line 1 - line 18 * * page 4, line 20 - page 5, line 29 * * page 2 - page 3 * * claims 1-6 *; | [X] - POLLOCK, B. G. ET AL, "Bupropion plasma levels and CYP2D6 phenotype", THER. DRUG MONIT. (1996), 18(5), 581-585, (1996), XP001040975 [X] 1-9,12,19,20,22-30,53-61 * page 582, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 581, column 2, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00007691-199610000-00010 | [X] - MUSSO ET AL, "Synthesis and evaluation of the antidepressant activity of the enentiomers of bupropion", CHIRALITY, WILEY-LISS, NEW YORK, US, (1993), vol. 5, no. 7, ISSN 0899-0042, pages 495 - 500, XP002107656 [X] 1-9,12,19,20,22-30,53-61 * page 495, column 1, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/chir.530050704 | [X] - PERUMAL, A. S. ET AL, "Down-regulation of.beta.-receptors by bupropion and its major metabolite in mouse brain", NEUROPHARMACOLOGY (1986), 25(12), 1323-6, (1986), XP001040976 [X] 1-9,12,19,20,22-30,53-61 * page 1323, column 1, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0028-3908(86)90103-6 | [X] - LAIZURE, S. CASEY ET AL, "Stability of bupropion and its major metabolites in human plasma", THER. DRUG MONIT. (1985), 7(4), 447-50, (1985), XP001040981 [X] 1-9,12,19,20,22-30,53-61 * page 447, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 1 * * figure 1 * | [X] - KELLEY JAMES L ET AL, "-2-(3,5-difluorophenyl)-3,5-dimethyl-2-morpholinol: A novel antidepressant agent and selective inhibitor of norepinephrine uptake", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (1996), vol. 39, no. 2, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 347 - 349, XP002164358 [X] 1-9,12,19,20,22-30,53-61 * page 347, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm950630p | [PX] - ADEOYE, O. M. ET AL, "Bupropion plasma concentration and antidepressant response in elderly patients: A prospective, randomized, double-blind study", INT. J. GERIATR. PSYCHOPHARMACOL. (2000), 2(3), 132-136, (2000), XP001040979 [PX] 1-9,12,19,20,22-30,54-61 * page 132, column 2, paragraph 3 * | Examination | - SIMON ET AL., "Bupropion sustained erelease for panic disorder", PSYCHOPHARMACOL. BULL. 2003; 37(4) 66-72 | - BYSTRITSKY ET AL., ""A pilot controlled trial of bupropion XL versus escitalopram in generalized anxiety disorder".", PSYCHOPHARMACOL. BULL. 2008; 41(1) 46-51 | by applicant | JPS6391352B | US3536809 | US3598123 | US3819706 | US3845770 | US3885046 | US3916899 | US4008719 | US4393078 | US4425363 | US4435449 | US4438138 | EP0118036 | US4507323 | US4571395 | US4624665 | US4655767 | US4687481 | US4797284 | US4798826 | US4810499 | US4835147 | US4895845 | US4917895 | US4927687 | US4935429 | US4956171 | US5059595 | US5073543 | US5091186 | US5120548 | US5163899 | US5217987 | US5232702 | US5234690 | US5273755 | US5273756 | US5308625 | US5354556 | US5356632 | US5358715 | US5358970 | US5372579 | US5421816 | US5447948 | US5466465 | US5494680 | US5505958 | US5541231 | US5554381 | US5560922 | US5585111 | US5591767 | US5639476 | US5656285 | US5667798 | US5674533 | US5698217 | US5731000 | US5733566 | US5741511 | US5747783 | US5753712 | US5763493 | US5770219 | US5814599 | US5817332 | US5833647 | US5879322 | US5906830 | - Physicians' Desk Reference®, (1999), pages 1252 - 1258 | - JUARISTI, E., Introduction to Stereochemistry & Conformational Analysis, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, INC., (1991), pages 144 - 151 | - ELIEL, E. L., Stereochemistry of Çarbon Compounds, MCGRAW-HILL, (1962), pages 49 - 53 | - ASCHER, J. A. ET AL., J. CLIN. PSYCHIATRY, (1995), vol. 56, pages 395 - 401 | - POSNER, J. ET AL., EUR. J: CLIN PHARMACAL., (1985), vol. 29, pages 97 - 103 | - SUCKOW, RF. ET AL., BIOMEDICAL CLUOMATOGRAPHY, (1997), vol. 11, pages 174 - 179 | - KELLEY, J. L. ET AL., J. MED. CHEM., (1996), vol. 39, pages 347 - 349 | - SUCKOW, R.F. ET AL., BIOMEDICAL CHROMATOGRAPHY, (1997), vol. 11, pages 174 - 179 | - POSNER, J. ET AL., EUR. J. CLIN. PHARNIACOL., (1985), vol. 29, pages 97 - 103 | - ROSE, J.E., ARMU. REV MED., (1996), vol. 47, pages 493 - 507 | - FERRY, L.H. ET AL., J. ADDICT. DIS., (1994), vol. 13, page A9 | - LIEF, H.I., AM. J. PSYCHIATRY, (1996), vol. 153, no. 3, page 442 | - Physicians' Desk Refererece®, (1999), pages 1252 - 1258 | - MUSSO ET AL., CHIRALITY, (1993), vol. 5, pages 495 - 500 | - WILEN, S. H. ET AL., TETRAHEDRON, (1977), vol. 33, page 2725 | - WILEN, S. H., Tables of Resolving Agents and Optical Resolutions, UNIV. OF NOTRE DAME PRESS, (1972), page 268 | - BLIEL, E. L., Stereochemistry of Carbon Compounds, MCGRAW-HILL, (1962), pages 49 - 53 | - FITZI, R.; SEEBACH, D., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (1986), vol. 25, page 345 | - GHARPURE, M. M.; RAO, A. S., SYNTHESIS, (1988), page 410 | - MOISSET, B. ET AL., BRAIN RES., (1975), vol. 92, pages 157 - 164 | - JANOWSKY, A. ET AL., J NEUROCHEM, (1986), vol. 46, pages 1272 - 1276 | - PEROVIC, S.; MULLER, W. E. G., BRAIN RES., (1995), vol. 92, pages 157 - 164 | - JENS T. CARSTENSEN, Drug Stabiliy: Principles & Practice, MARCEL DEKKER, (1995), pages 379 - 80 | - JANOWSKY, A. ET AL., J NEUROCHEM., (1986), vol. 46, pages 1272 - 1276 | - PEROVIC, S.; MULLER, W. E.G., BRAIN RES., (1995), vol. 92, pages 157 - 164 | - GREEN; MURRAY, J. PHARM. PHARMACOL, (1989), vol. 41, pages 879 - 880 | - BANNON, A.W. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1998), vol. 279, pages 77 - 81 | - DUBUSSON, D.; DENNIS, S.G., SCIENCE, (1977), vol. 4, page 161 | - S.H. KIM; J.M. CHUNG, SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 50, page 355 |