EP1743775 - Coated paper for sheet fed offset printing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAPPI Netherlands Services B.V. Biesenweg 16 6211 AA Maastricht / NL | [2007/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haenen, JP. G. H. F Gascogne 8 6245 Eysden / NL | 02 /
Resch, P.K Schlossstrasse 1 8071 Vasoldsberg / AT | 03 /
Scholte H.B Karolingenstraat 5 6132 GJ Sittard / NL | [2007/03] | Representative(s) | Bremi, Tobias Hans Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2007/03] | Bremi, Tobias Hans Isler & Pedrazzini AG Postfach 6940 8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 05106431.9 | 13.07.2005 | [2007/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1743775 | Date: | 17.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/00, B41M1/06, D21H19/36, D21H19/82, D21H19/84 | [2007/03] | CPC: |
B41M5/502 (EP,US);
B41M5/50 (KR);
B41M1/06 (EP,KR,US);
B41M5/504 (EP,US);
B41M5/506 (EP,US);
B41M5/52 (EP,KR,US);
B41M5/5218 (EP,US);
B41M5/5254 (EP,US);
D21H19/36 (KR);
D21H19/38 (EP,US);
B41M2205/12 (EP,US);
B41M2205/38 (EP,US);
D21H19/822 (EP,US);
D21H19/84 (EP,US);
D21H21/52 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249987 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24999 (EP,US);
Y10T428/259 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31993 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | [2007/38] |
Former [2007/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Beschichtetes Papier für den Bogenoffsetdruck | [2007/03] | English: | Coated paper for sheet fed offset printing | [2007/03] | French: | Papier couche pour une presse offset à imprimer des feuilles | [2007/03] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/15] | 16.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH10324517 ; | [A]US3740248 (BUHLER W, et al) [A] 1-33 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0501441 (OJI YUKA GOSEISHI KK [JP]) [A] 1-33 * page 5, line 51 - page 6, line 3; figure 1 *; | [XY]EP0648894 (WIGGINS TEAPE GROUP LTD [GB]) [X] 1,9,10,12,15,16,19,20,30,32 * page 2, line 57 - page 4, line 20 * * page 5, lines 36-41 * [Y] 3-8,11,13,17,18,21-29,31,33; | [XY]EP0709223 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,9,11,30,32 * page 3, lines 52-59 * * page 4, lines 34-39 * * page 6, lines 17-25 * [Y] 3-8,10,12,15-29,31,33; | [YA]EP0770729 (JUJO PAPER CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 15,26 * page 4, line 40 - page 5, line 20 * [A] 1-14,16-25,27-33; | [XY]EP1112856 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,9,11,12,15,28,30,32 * paragraphs [0021] - [0029] - [0035] - [0038]; figure 1 * [Y] 3-8,10,13,16-27,29,31,33; | [A]US6391155 (WURSTER HARTMUT [DE], et al) [A] 1-33* column 3, line 23 - column 7, line 56 *; | [YA]US6447881 (NISHIDA HIROYASU [JP], et al) [Y] 11 * column 2, line 41 - column 7, line 60 * [A] 1-10,12-33; | [YA]GB2380695 (ILFORD IMAGING UK LTD [GB]) [Y] 15,25 * page 3, lines 1-9 * * page 4, lines 7-30 * * page 6, lines 16-27 * * page 8, lines 12-22 * [A] 1-14,16-24,26-33; | [XY]US2003143345 (SATOU SEIJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,9,11,30,32 * paragraphs [0037] , [0039] - [0044] * * paragraphs [0063] - [0066] - [0074] - [0080] * [Y] 3-8,10,12,15-29,31,33; | [XY]WO2004030917 (SAPPI NETHERLANDS SERVICES BV [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,24-26,28,29,32,33 * page 4, lines 15-17,26 * * page 5, line 1 - page 11, line 7 * * page 11, line 22 - page 12, line 30 * * page 13, lines 16-19 * * pages 16-24 * [Y] 3-13,15-23,27,30,31 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 1999, no. 03, & JP10324517 A 19981208 (MIZUSAWA IND CHEM LTD) [Y] 9-11,16,30 * abstract * |