EP1744119 - Swept-source optical coherence tomography [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Proximion Fiber Systems AB Skalholtsgatan 10B 164 40 Kista / SE | [2007/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stubbe, Raoul Sommarvägen 5 182 74, STOCKSUND / SE | 02 /
Sahlgren, Bengt Norrholmsvägen 92 132 31, SALTSJÖ-BOO / SE | [2007/03] | Representative(s) | Pierrou, Mattias, et al Awapatent AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/03] | Pierrou, Mattias, et al Awapatent AB, P.O. Box 45 086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 05106529.0 | 15.07.2005 | [2007/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1744119 | Date: | 17.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01B9/02 | [2007/03] | CPC: |
G01B9/02057 (EP,US);
G01B11/2441 (EP,US);
G01B9/02004 (EP,US);
G01B9/0205 (EP,US);
G01B9/02072 (EP,US);
G01B9/02091 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/03] | Title | German: | Optische Kohärenztomographie mit einer Wobbelsignalquelle | [2007/03] | English: | Swept-source optical coherence tomography | [2007/03] | French: | Tomographie par cohérence optique avec une source à balayage | [2007/03] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/33] | 06.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/30] | 09.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6485413 (BOPPART STEPHEN A [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * column 5, line 47 - column 6, line 60 * * column 30, line 57 - column 31, line 34 * * figures 1,2,14,15,20 *; | [X]US2004239938 (IZATT JOSEPH A [US]) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0047] * * figures 1a,1b *; | [X]WO2005047813 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * page 21, line 5 - page 22, line 24 * * page 30, line 20 - page 35, line 17 * * page 43, lines 5-30 * * figures 6,10a *; | [X] - F.D. NIELSEN, L. THRANE, J. BLACK, A.O. BJARKLEV, P.E. ANDERSEN, "Broad bandwidth light-wave frequency synthesizer in the 1-1.1 um range", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, (200504), vol. 5709, pages 222 - 230, XP002359967 [X] 1-20 * page 222 - page 225 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.590453 | by applicant | US6485413 | US2004239938 | WO2005047813 | - F. D. NIELSEN ET AL., "Broad bandwidth light-wave frequency synthesizer in the 1-1.1 range", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, vol. 5709, pages 222 - 230 |