EP1621063 - Tool for beating olives or other similar agricultural products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.12.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZANON S.R.L. Via Madonnetta 30 35011 Campodarsego (Padova) / IT | [2006/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZANON, Franco Via Madonnetta, 28 35011, CAMPODARSEGO / IT | [2006/05] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/05] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati S.p.A. Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 05106641.3 | 20.07.2005 | [2006/05] | Priority number, date | IT2004PD00204 | 30.07.2004 Original published format: IT PD20040204 | [2006/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1621063 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1621063 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | [2006/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1621063 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A01D46/26 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
A01D46/264 (EP);
A01D2046/266 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/05] | Title | German: | Erntegerät insbesondere für Oliven oder dergleichen landwirtschaftlichen Produkte | [2006/05] | English: | Tool for beating olives or other similar agricultural products | [2006/05] | French: | Outil moissonneur en particulier pour des olives ou produits agricoles similaires | [2006/05] | Examination procedure | 14.09.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/44] | 12.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.02.2008 | BE | 20.02.2008 | CY | 20.02.2008 | CZ | 20.02.2008 | DK | 20.02.2008 | EE | 20.02.2008 | FI | 20.02.2008 | LT | 20.02.2008 | LV | 20.02.2008 | NL | 20.02.2008 | PL | 20.02.2008 | RO | 20.02.2008 | SI | 20.02.2008 | SK | 20.02.2008 | TR | 20.02.2008 | BG | 20.05.2008 | SE | 20.05.2008 | DE | 21.05.2008 | IS | 20.06.2008 | LU | 20.07.2008 | IE | 21.07.2008 | PT | 21.07.2008 | MC | 31.07.2008 | HU | 21.08.2008 | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/33] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
BE | 20.02.2008 | ||
CY | 20.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2008 | ||
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
EE | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
LT | 20.02.2008 | ||
LV | 20.02.2008 | ||
NL | 20.02.2008 | ||
PL | 20.02.2008 | ||
RO | 20.02.2008 | ||
SI | 20.02.2008 | ||
SK | 20.02.2008 | ||
BG | 20.05.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
DE | 21.05.2008 | ||
IS | 20.06.2008 | ||
LU | 20.07.2008 | ||
IE | 21.07.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/45] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
BE | 20.02.2008 | ||
CY | 20.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2008 | ||
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
EE | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
LT | 20.02.2008 | ||
LV | 20.02.2008 | ||
NL | 20.02.2008 | ||
PL | 20.02.2008 | ||
RO | 20.02.2008 | ||
SI | 20.02.2008 | ||
SK | 20.02.2008 | ||
BG | 20.05.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
DE | 21.05.2008 | ||
IS | 20.06.2008 | ||
IE | 21.07.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
BE | 20.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2008 | ||
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
EE | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
LT | 20.02.2008 | ||
LV | 20.02.2008 | ||
NL | 20.02.2008 | ||
PL | 20.02.2008 | ||
RO | 20.02.2008 | ||
SI | 20.02.2008 | ||
SK | 20.02.2008 | ||
BG | 20.05.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
DE | 21.05.2008 | ||
IS | 20.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
BE | 20.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2008 | ||
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
EE | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
LT | 20.02.2008 | ||
LV | 20.02.2008 | ||
NL | 20.02.2008 | ||
PL | 20.02.2008 | ||
RO | 20.02.2008 | ||
SI | 20.02.2008 | ||
SK | 20.02.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
DE | 21.05.2008 | ||
IS | 20.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
BE | 20.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2008 | ||
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
LT | 20.02.2008 | ||
LV | 20.02.2008 | ||
NL | 20.02.2008 | ||
PL | 20.02.2008 | ||
RO | 20.02.2008 | ||
SI | 20.02.2008 | ||
SK | 20.02.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
DE | 21.05.2008 | ||
IS | 20.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
BE | 20.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2008 | ||
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
LT | 20.02.2008 | ||
LV | 20.02.2008 | ||
NL | 20.02.2008 | ||
PL | 20.02.2008 | ||
RO | 20.02.2008 | ||
SI | 20.02.2008 | ||
SK | 20.02.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
DE | 21.05.2008 | ||
IS | 20.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
BE | 20.02.2008 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2008 | ||
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
LV | 20.02.2008 | ||
NL | 20.02.2008 | ||
PL | 20.02.2008 | ||
RO | 20.02.2008 | ||
SI | 20.02.2008 | ||
SK | 20.02.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
IS | 20.06.2008 | ||
PT | 21.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
BE | 20.02.2008 | ||
DK | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
LV | 20.02.2008 | ||
PL | 20.02.2008 | ||
SI | 20.02.2008 | ||
SE | 20.05.2008 | ||
IS | 20.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
BE | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
LV | 20.02.2008 | ||
PL | 20.02.2008 | ||
SI | 20.02.2008 | ||
IS | 20.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
BE | 20.02.2008 | ||
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
PL | 20.02.2008 | ||
IS | 20.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 20.02.2008 | |
FI | 20.02.2008 | ||
IS | 20.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | FI | 20.02.2008 | |
IS | 20.06.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB433238 (CHARLES IRVING WILSON) [Y] 20-22 * figure 1 * * page 1, line 91 - line 97 *; | [A]CH639530 (WEBER HANSJAKOB [CH]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0938839 (TROIANO MICHELE E VALENTINI AN [IT], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP1051899 (ZANON S N C DI ZANON FRANCO E [IT]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]EP1116432 (PELLENC SA [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [XY]EP1175823 (PATERLINI REMO [IT]) [X] 1,9 * figures 1-6 * * column 1, line 3 - line 13 * * column 1, line 53 - line 58 * * column 2, line 20 - line 38 * * column 5, line 32 - column 6, line 4 * [Y] 20-22; | [A]EP1273222 (ZANON S N C DI ZANON FRANCO E [IT]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | IT1306657 | IT1306658 | IT1306661 | IT1306687 |