blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1626061

EP1626061 - Process for the preparation of polyureas in powder form [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.06.2011
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip10.06.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.07.2011  [2011/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rhein Chemie Rheinau GmbH
Düsseldorfer Strasse 23-27
68219 Mannheim / DE
[2006/07]
Inventor(s)01 / Laufer, Wilhelm, Dr.
Brahmsstr. 3
68165 Mannheim / DE
02 / Wuehr, Michael
Heddesheimerstr. 47
69493 Hirschberg / DE
03 / Allgöwer, Klaus
Albert-Haueisen-Ring 14
67071 Ludwigshafen / DE
04 / Galda, Patrick, Dr.
Rhode-Island-Allee 69
76149 Karlsruhe / DE
 [2006/07]
Representative(s)Siegers, Britta, et al
c/o Lanxess Deutschland GmbH
LEX-IP
Kennedyplatz 1
50569 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/20]Siegers, Britta, et al
Lanxess Deutschland GmbH LIP Intellectual Property Rights Gebäude Q 18
51369 Leverkusen / DE
Former [2008/40]Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos
Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2006/07]Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos
Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date05106645.420.07.2005
[2006/07]
Priority number, dateDE2004103915611.08.2004         Original published format: DE102004039156
DE2004104487614.09.2004         Original published format: DE102004044876
[2006/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1626061
Date:15.02.2006
Language:DE
[2006/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.10.2005
ClassificationIPC:C08J3/12, C08G18/08, C08G18/28, C08G18/32, C08G18/12, C10M119/24
[2006/07]
CPC:
C10M177/00 (EP,US); C08G18/00 (KR); C08G18/0852 (EP,US);
C08G18/10 (KR); C08G18/285 (EP,US); C08G18/3228 (EP,US);
C08G18/324 (EP,US); C08J3/12 (EP,KR,US); C10M119/24 (EP,US);
C08J2375/02 (EP,US); C10M2207/1285 (EP,US); C10M2217/0456 (EP,US);
C10N2020/06 (EP,US); C10N2070/00 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
C10M2207/1285, C10M2217/0456 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/07]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung pulverförmiger (Poly)harnstoffe[2006/07]
English:Process for the preparation of polyureas in powder form[2006/07]
French:Procédé de fabrication de polyurées pulvérulentes.[2006/07]
Examination procedure19.07.2006Examination requested  [2006/35]
04.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.01.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.09.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.01.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/28]
28.02.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2011/28]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.09.2006
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201006   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US3868350  (REIFF HELMUT, et al) [X] 1-32 * siehe Ansprüche 1, 16 und 17; Spalte 6, Zeile 53 bis Spalte 7, Zeile 52; Beispiele *;
 [X]US4119613  (REISCHL ARTUR, et al) [X] 1-32 * siehe Ansprüche 1-11; Spalte 1, Zeile 65 bis Spalte 2, Zeile 55; Spalte 3, Zeilen 3-35; Spalte 8, Zeilen 45-65; Beispiel 13 *;
 [DXA]EP0534248  (BAYER AG [DE]) [DX] 20-32 * siehe Spalte 3, Zeilen 35-40; Seite 4, Zeilen 22-24 * [A] 1-19;
 [XA]US2002040763  (GRENDA WERNER [DE], et al) [X] 20-30,32 * siehe Absätze 7, 12 und 17-18 *[A] 1-19,31
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.