EP1624120 - Multilayer sheath particularly for insulating walls and lofts of buildings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.08.2010 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.09.2010 [2010/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Silcart S.r.l. Via Spercenigo, 5 31030 Carbonera - Frazione Mignagola (TV) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/06] | For all designated states SILCART S.r.l. Via Spercenigo, 5 31030 Carbonera - Frazione Mignagola (Prov. of Treviso) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Faotto, Ugo Vicolo Fratelli Bandiera, 21 31100 Treviso / IT | [2006/06] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/06] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati S.p.A. Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 05107092.8 | 01.08.2005 | [2006/06] | Priority number, date | IT2004TV00095 | 05.08.2004 Original published format: IT TV20040095 | [2006/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1624120 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1624120 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/66, B32B5/16, B32B27/24 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
B32B5/022 (EP);
E04B1/665 (EP,US);
B32B27/12 (EP);
B32B27/24 (EP);
B32B27/32 (EP);
B32B27/36 (EP);
B32B5/16 (EP);
E04B1/78 (EP);
B32B2255/10 (EP);
B32B2255/26 (EP);
B32B2262/0253 (EP);
B32B2262/0276 (EP);
B32B2262/08 (EP);
B32B2262/14 (EP);
B32B2264/025 (EP);
B32B2307/102 (EP);
B32B2307/304 (EP);
B32B2307/3065 (EP);
B32B2307/71 (EP);
B32B2307/7246 (EP);
B32B2307/726 (EP);
B32B2307/7265 (EP);
B32B2307/762 (EP);
B32B2419/04 (EP);
B32B2607/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/06] | E04B1/66 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/06] | Title | German: | Mehrlagigefolie besonders zum Isolieren von Wänden und Dachböden von Gebaüden | [2006/06] | English: | Multilayer sheath particularly for insulating walls and lofts of buildings | [2006/06] | French: | Feuille multicouche en particulier pour l'isolation de murs et de greniers de bâtiments | [2006/06] | Examination procedure | 15.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 02.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/36] | 16.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4567080 (KORSGAARD VAGN [DK]) [X] 1-3 * figure 1; claims 1-4 *; | [X]DE3524580 (DEUTAG MISCHWERKE GMBH) [X] 1-3,12 * figure 1; claims 1,2,4,5 *; | [A]DE3902995 (HOCHTIEF AG VORM. GEBR. HELFMANN, 4300 ESSEN, DE) [A] 1-3,8,9,12,14 * figures 1,2; claims 1,4,6-8 *; | [X]DE4418319 (STOCKHAUSEN CHEM FAB GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,12 * figure 1; examples 17-19; claims 1,4,5,15,16 *; | [A]FR2778579 (SCHOELLER ET HOESCH SARL [FR]) [A] 1-3 * figure 1; claims 1,6 *; | [X]WO2004039493 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,12 * page 1, lines 30-33 - page 5, lines 2-4,13-16 * * page 7, lines 14-17; claim 1 19 20 *; | [E]WO2005112691 (FISCHER JOERG [DE]) [E] 1-3,12* figures 1,3,4; claims 1-6,9 * |