EP1624503 - OLEDs having improved luminance stability [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Display Co., Ltd. 20, Yoido-dong, Youngdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | [2008/25] |
Former [2006/06] | For all designated states LG. Philips LCD Co., Ltd. 20 Yoido-dong, Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aziz, Hany 2457 Chaplin Road Oakville, Ontario L6H 7L6 / CA | [2006/06] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/11] | TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/42] | TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/06] | Zimmer, Franz-Josef Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05107133.0 | 02.08.2005 | [2006/06] | Priority number, date | US20040909689 | 02.08.2004 Original published format: US 909689 | [2006/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1624503 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1624503 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | [2007/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1624503 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/50, H01L51/52 | [2012/42] | CPC: |
H10K50/155 (EP,US);
H05B33/26 (KR);
H10K50/17 (EP,KR,US);
H10K50/816 (EP,KR,US);
H10K50/818 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S428/917 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/06] | H01L51/50 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/30] |
Former [2006/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | OLEDs mit verbesserter Luminanzstabilität | [2006/06] | English: | OLEDs having improved luminance stability | [2006/06] | French: | OLEDs présentant des caractéristiques de luminance améliorées | [2006/06] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 15.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.06.2008 | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5719467 (ANTONIADIS HOMER [US], et al); | [XY]EP1017118 (SHARP KK [JP]); | [X]EP1167488 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]); | [XY]US2003116772 (YAMAZAKI SHUNPEI [JP], et al); | [X]US2004004433 (LAMANSKY SERGEY A [US], et al) | Examination | EP1227527 | JP2004139981 | by applicant | EP1017118 | EP1167488 | US2003116772 | US2004004433 | JP2004139981 |