EP1645977 - Partially materialized views [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/15] | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zhou, Jingren c/o MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 02 /
Goldstein, Jonathan D. c/o MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 03 /
Larson, Per-Ake c/o MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2006/15] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/21] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/15] | Zimmer, Franz-Josef Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05107182.7 | 04.08.2005 | [2006/15] | Priority number, date | US20040604401 | 24.08.2004 Original published format: US 604401 | US20040971600 | 21.10.2004 Original published format: US 971600 | [2006/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1645977 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1645977 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | [2006/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2006/15] | CPC: |
G06F16/24539 (EP,US);
G06F17/40 (KR);
G06F16/2393 (EP,US);
G06F16/24552 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/15] | Title | German: | Teilweise verwirklichte Ansichten | [2006/15] | English: | Partially materialized views | [2006/15] | French: | Vues partiellement matérialisées | [2006/15] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 06.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/35] | 13.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004034616 (WITKOWSKI ANDREW [US], et al) [A] 1-36 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0051] ** paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0117] *; | [X] - LARSON P-A ET AL, "MTCache: Mid-Tier Database Caching for SQL Server", IEEE DATA ENG. BULL. [JOURNAL], vol. 27, no. 2, (200406), pages 35 - 40, URL: http://sites.computer.org/debull/A04JUN-CD.pdf#search=%22MTCache%20control%20OR%20table%20%22Guo%22%22, (20060921), XP002399988 [X] 1-36 * page 35, line 1 - page 35, line 15 * * page 36, line 1 - page 36, line 27 * * page 37, line 5 - page 38, line 16 * * page 39, line 1 - page 40, line 5 * | [X] - LARSON P-A ET AL, "MTCache: transparent mid-tier database caching in SQL server", DATA ENGINEERING, 2004. PROCEEDINGS. 20TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON BOSTON, MA, USA 30 MARCH - 2 APRIL 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20040330), ISBN 0-7695-2065-0, pages 177 - 188, XP010713763 [X] 1-36 * page 177, column R, line 12 - page 178, column L, line 22 * * page 179, column L, line 24 - page 179, column R, line 28 * * page 180, column L, line 24 - page 180, column L, line 36 * * page 181, column L, line 18 - page 181, column R, line 44 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICDE.2004.1319994 |