EP1752358 - Electro-hydraulic power steering and method of controlling the rotational speed of its pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC 600 Parklane Towers East Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | [2007/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Figura, Michael Georg Fliederweg 2 41542 Dormagen / DE | 02 /
Vliem, Edwin Helsbeemd 7 5521 SN Eersel / NL | [2007/07] | Representative(s) | Drömer, Hans-Carsten, et al Ford-Werke Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung NH/DRP Henry-Ford-Strasse 1 50725 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/07] | Drömer, Hans-Carsten, et al Ford-Werke Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung NH/DRP, Henry-Ford-Strasse 1 50725 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 05107331.0 | 10.08.2005 | [2007/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1752358 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/065 | [2007/07] | CPC: |
B62D5/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Elektro-hydraulische Servolenkung und Verfahren zur Steuerung ihrer Pumpendrehzahl | [2007/07] | English: | Electro-hydraulic power steering and method of controlling the rotational speed of its pump | [2007/07] | French: | Direction assistée électro-hydraulique et procédé de commande de vitesse de rotation de sa pompe | [2007/07] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0044733 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1,2,6 * page 5, line 24 - page 7, line 4 * * page 10, line 16 - page 15, line 2 * * page 16, line 14 - page 17, line 1 * * figures 1,3,6 *; | [X]EP0930215 (KOYO SEIKO CO [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * paragraphs [0026] - [0032] - [0034] - [0051] - [0065] - [0071]; figures 1-3,5-7 *; | [X]EP0972695 (KOYO SEIKO CO [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * paragraphs [0034] - [0056]; figures 4,5 *; | [A]EP1114764 (VISTEON GLOBAL TECH INC [US]) [A] 1,2,6* paragraphs [0012] - [0024]; figures 1-3,5 * |