EP1754887 - Device for detecting lightning strike damage to a wind turbine blade [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2015/43] |
Former [2007/08] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krug, Florian / Pembaurstrasse 16 81243, München / DE | 02 /
Schram, Christian / Gollierstrasse 20 80339, München / DE | [2015/43] |
Former [2007/08] | 01 /
Krug, Florian Pembaurstrasse 16 81243, München / DE | ||
02 /
Schram, Christian Gollierstrasse 20 80339, München / DE | Representative(s) | Bedford, Grant Richard GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [2015/43] |
Former [2012/04] | Bedford, Grant Richard Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2007/08] | Hilleringmann, Jochen Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus am Dom) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 05107571.1 | 17.08.2005 | [2007/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1754887 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1754887 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F03D11/00 | [2007/08] | CPC: |
F03D80/30 (EP,US);
F03D17/00 (EP,US);
F03D80/00 (EP,US);
F05B2260/80 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES [2015/43] |
Former [2007/43] | DE, DK, ES | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Erkennung von Blitzeinschlagschaden an einem Windturbinenblatt | [2007/08] | English: | Device for detecting lightning strike damage to a wind turbine blade | [2007/08] | French: | Dispositif de détection d'endommagement par la foudre dans une pale d'éolienne | [2007/08] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/33] | 22.08.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.10.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, EE, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.04.2008 | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4026660 (UEDA KAZUO, et al) [A] 1,2 * column A * * column 1, line 5 - line 18 * * column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 9 *; | [X]DE10065314 (IGUS INGENIEURGEMEINSCHAFT UMW [DE]) [X] 1,2 * column A; figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0016] - [0027] *; | [X]DE202004001090U (ZUESCHER THOMAS [DE], et al) [X] 1 * column W *; | [X]DE10259680 (WOBBEN ALOYS [DE]) [X] 1 * column A; figure -; claim - * * paragraphs [0004] - [0010] - [0015] , [0016] *; | [A]US2004130842 (JOHANSEN OLUF PETER KAAD [DK], et al) [A] 1-3* column W *; | [X]WO2004111686 (LM GLASFIBER AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-3 * page 2, line 5 - page 3, line 11 * * page 5, line 13 - page 6, line 24 * * page 7, line 7 - line 18 * * page 7, line 29 - page 8, line 7 * * page 9, line 1 - line 10 * * page 9, line 29 - page 10, line 21 * * page 13, line 10 - page 15, line 5; figures 2,3 *; | [A]WO2005068834 (LM GLASFIBER AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-3 * column W * |