Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
30.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2010 [2010/35] |
06.04.2010 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
30.09.2009 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
02.05.2008 | Change - representative | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] |
18.04.2008 | Change - representative | published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] |
11.04.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.08.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
04.05.2007 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
06.10.2006 | Definitive list of designations | published on 08.11.2006 [2006/45] |
29.09.2006 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
29.09.2006 | First examination report | |
08.09.2006 | Request for examination filed | published on 11.10.2006 [2006/41] |
13.01.2006 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.03.2006 [2006/09] |