Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7634724 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2009 | B2 | US2006048048 | 02.03.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92919704 | 30.08.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20060050040 | Global Dossier | 19.05.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US92919704 | 30.08.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2006072980 | Global Dossier | 16.03.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US92919704 | 30.08.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1630739 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US92919704 | 30.08.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1744036 | 08.03.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US92919704 | 30.08.2004 |