EP1643801 - Use of a hearing aid system with at least two hearing aids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Audiologische Technik GmbH Gebbertstrasse 125 91058 Erlangen / DE | [2006/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Puder, Henning, Dr. Henkestraße 116 91052 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
Steinbuss, Andre Sandrartstraße 49 90419 Nürnberg / DE | [2006/14] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/02] | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG CT IP Com E Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/14] | Berg, Peter, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05108059.6 | 02.09.2005 | [2006/14] | Priority number, date | DE20041047759 | 30.09.2004 Original published format: DE102004047759 | [2006/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1643801 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1643801 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | [2009/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00 | [2006/14] | CPC: |
H04R25/558 (EP,US);
H04R25/554 (EP,US);
H04R2225/55 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2010/26] |
Former [2006/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verwendung eines Hörhilfegerätesystems mit wenigstens zwei Hörhilfegeräten | [2006/14] | English: | Use of a hearing aid system with at least two hearing aids | [2006/14] | French: | Utilisation d'un système de prothèse auditive avec au moins deux prothèses auditives | [2006/14] | Examination procedure | 01.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/40] | 12.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5757932 (LINDEMANN ERIC [US], et al) [DA] 4-6 * abstract ** column 3, line 5 - column 7, line 30; figures 1-5 *; | [DA]EP0941014 (SIEMENS AUDIOLOGISCHE TECHNIK [DE]) [DA] 1,4-6,8,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1,2 *; | [DA]DE10048354 (SIEMENS AUDIOLOGISCHE TECHNIK [DE]) [DA] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1379103 (AVAYA TECHNOLOGY CORP [US]) [X] 4-6,8,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0022]; figures 1,2 * |