EP1646168 - Method and apparatus for providing a user control interface in audio multistreaming [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2016 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2016 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2006/15] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416 Maetan 3-Dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Kyung-ju 944-1509 9-danji APT, Byeokjeokgol, Youngtong-dong Yeongton-gu, Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Jin-hyong 206-1401 Taeyoung APT, Yeongdeok-ri, Giheung-eup Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2006/15] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/15] | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 05108262.6 | 08.09.2005 | [2006/15] | Priority number, date | KR20040077192 | 24.09.2004 Original published format: KR 2004077192 | [2006/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1646168 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1646168 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04H1/00 | [2006/15] | CPC: |
G06F3/0219 (EP,US);
G06Q50/10 (KR);
G06F3/0482 (EP,US);
G06F3/0489 (EP,US);
G06F3/16 (KR);
G06F3/165 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2012/28] |
Former [2006/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Bereitstellung einer Benutzerschnittstelle für Echtzeittonmehrfachübertragungen | [2006/15] | English: | Method and apparatus for providing a user control interface in audio multistreaming | [2006/15] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour fournir une interface utilisateur pour la transmission audiophonique multiple en temps réel | [2006/15] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/19] | 23.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.05.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/37] | 01.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/38] | 09.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.01.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]EP1124175 (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [I] 12,13 * column 9, lines 25-31 * * column 11, lines 26-28 * * column 12, lines 46-49 * * column 12, line 58 - column 13, line 3 * * column 13, lines 44-45; figure 6 *[A] 1 | Examination | WO0207432 | by applicant | EP1124175 |