EP1647461 - Piston pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2010/50] |
Former [2006/16] | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dinkel, Dieter Bahnstrasse 21 65824 Schwalbach / DE | 02 /
Otto, Albrecht Vilbeler Str. 47a 61137 Schöneck / DE | 03 /
Sonnenschein, Georg Hauptstrasse 31 65760 Eschborn / DE | 04 /
Zentgraf, Hans-Georg In der Waldgartenstrasse 20 65428 Rüsselsheim / DE | 05 /
Tarandek, Kristian Alicestr. 106 63263 Neu-Isenburg / DE | [2010/38] |
Former [2008/02] | 01 /
Dinkel, Dieter Bahnstrasse 21 65824, Schwalbach / DE | ||
02 /
Otto, Albrecht Vilbeler Str. 47a 61137, Schöneck / DE | |||
03 /
Sonnenschein, Georg Hauptstrasse 31 65760, Eschborn / DE | |||
04 /
Zentgraf, Hans-Georg In der Waldgartenstrasse 20 65428, Rüsselsheim / DE | |||
05 /
Tarandek, Kristian Alicestr. 106 63263, Neu-Isenburg / DE | |||
Former [2006/16] | 01 /
Dinkel, Dieter Bahnstrasse 21 65824, Schwalbach / DE | ||
02 /
Otto, Albrecht Vilbeler Str. 47a 61137, Schöneck / DE | |||
03 /
Sonnenschein, Georg Hauptstrasse 31 65760, Eschborn / DE | |||
04 /
Zentgraf, Hans-Georg In der Waldgartenstrasse 20 65428, Rüsselsheim / DE | |||
05 /
Tarandek, Kristian Alisestr. 106 63263, Neu-Isenburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05108940.7 | 28.09.2005 | [2006/16] | Priority number, date | DE20041050579 | 15.10.2004 Original published format: DE102004050579 | DE20051043266 | 12.09.2005 Original published format: DE102005043266 | [2006/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1647461 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1647461 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | [2007/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1647461 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/40, F04B1/04 | [2006/16] | CPC: |
F04B1/0426 (EP,US);
B60T8/4031 (EP,US);
F04B1/0408 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2008/22] |
Former [2006/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kolbenpumpe | [2006/16] | English: | Piston pump | [2006/16] | French: | Pompe à piston | [2006/16] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/19] | 20.03.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 24.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4027794 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1,10,11,14* abstract *; | [A]WO9705388 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE], et al) [A] 11,14 * figure 2 *; | [A]DE19732810 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 4,8,10,14 * column 3, line 43 - line 49; figure 1 *; | [AD]EP0734494 (LUCAS INDUSTRIES LTD [GB]) [AD] 1,10,11,14 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0045]; figure 8 *; | [XA]WO2004037624 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE], et al) [X] 1,11,12,14 * page 6, paragraph 2; figure 3 * [A] 10; | [AD]DE10346237 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [AD] 1,10,11,14 * paragraph [0024]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029] * | by applicant | DE19732810 | EP0734494 | WO2004037624 | DE10346237 |