EP1634682 - Paper cutting apparatus and image forming apparatus with such a paper cutting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO, Norishige Konica Corporation 2970 Ishikawa-cho, Hachioji-shi 192-8505, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
HIRATA, Tetsuo Konica Corporation 2970 Ishikawa-cho, Hachioji-shi 192-8505, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
YASHIRO, Shinji 5-4-12 Ohwada-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo / JP | [2006/11] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/11] | Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05109307.8 | 21.06.2001 | [2006/11] | Priority number, date | JP20000191060 | 26.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000191060 | [2006/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1634682 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1634682 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | [2006/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1634682 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B26D5/00 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
G03G15/6582 (EP,US);
B26D1/08 (EP,US);
B26D7/015 (EP,US);
B26D7/025 (EP,US);
B26D7/0625 (EP,US);
B26D7/0675 (EP,US);
G03G2215/00818 (EP,US);
G03G2215/00936 (EP,US);
Y10T83/18 (EP,US);
Y10T83/202 (EP,US);
Y10T83/4607 (EP,US);
Y10T83/541 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/11] | Title | German: | Papierschneidvorrichtung sowie Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung eines Bildes ausgerüstet mit einer solchen Papierschneidvorrichtung | [2006/11] | English: | Paper cutting apparatus and image forming apparatus with such a paper cutting apparatus | [2006/11] | French: | Dispositif pour la coupe de papier ainsi que dispositif de formation d'image équipé d'un tel dispositif de coupe | [2006/11] | Examination procedure | 07.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/11] | 22.03.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01115098.4 / EP1166976 | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5159395 (FARRELL MICHAEL E [US], et al); | [A]US5461469 (FARRELL MICHAEL E [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * column 9, line 50 - line 55 * * column 10, line 1 - line 14 * * column 15, line 50 - line 60 *; | [A]US5467677 (KINSON JR ROBERT D [US]); | [A]EP0768262 (BOURG C P SA [BE]); | [E]EP1129972 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [E] 1,6 * paragraph [0095] * |