EP1717454 - Joint connecting clip and joint connecting structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toflo Corporation 3-17, Minamidaira 4-chome Hino-shi, Tokyo 191-0041 / JP | [2006/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iida, Shuhei TOFLO CORPORATION, 3-17, Minamidaira 4-chome Hino-shi, 191-0041, Tokyo / JP | [2008/49] |
Former [2006/44] | 01 /
Iida, Shuhei TOFLO CORPORATION, 3-17, Minamidaira 4-chome, Hin 191-0041, Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2006/44] | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Scheider Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 05109409.2 | 11.10.2005 | [2006/44] | Priority number, date | JP20050128697 | 26.04.2005 Original published format: JP 2005128697 | [2006/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1717454 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1717454 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16B7/04, F16L23/032, F16L23/00 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
F16L37/1225 (EP,US);
F16L23/04 (EP,KR,US);
F16B2/10 (EP,US);
F16B7/0426 (EP,US);
F16L37/04 (KR);
Y10T403/57 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, GB, NL [2007/28] |
Former [2006/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verbindungsclip und Verbindungsstruktur | [2006/44] | English: | Joint connecting clip and joint connecting structure | [2006/44] | French: | Clip de raccordement et structure de raccordement | [2006/44] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/01] | 20.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.06.2007 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 19.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2007 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted | 16.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.12.2008 | NL | 17.12.2008 | [2009/45] |
Former [2009/27] | NL | 17.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP2003028368 ; | [A]US4776721 (LANGE FREDRIC A [US]) [A] 2,6,7,9,13,14* column 5, line 28 - column 6, line 18; figure 9 *; | [A]EP0332507 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [A] 1,3,4,8,10,11 * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 33; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US5048876 (WALLSKOG HARVEY A [US]) [A] 1,3,8,10 * column 4, line 18 - column 5, line 23; figures 1-3 * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030512), vol. 2003, no. 05, & JP2003028368 A 20030129 (OCHIAI:KK) [AD] 1,2,6,8,9,13 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2003028368 |