EP1655997 - Method for amplifying an acoustic signal and corresponding acoustic system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Audiologische Technik GmbH Gebbertstrasse 125 91058 Erlangen / DE | [2006/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kasanmascheff, Robert Buchenweg 17 91315 Höchstadt / DE | [2006/19] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/02] | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG CT IP Com E Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/19] | Berg, Peter, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05109472.0 | 12.10.2005 | [2006/19] | Priority number, date | DE20041053776 | 08.11.2004 Original published format: DE102004053776 | [2006/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1655997 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1655997 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | [2009/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1655997 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00 | [2006/19] | CPC: |
H04R25/453 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, LI [2010/01] |
Former [2006/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verstärkung eines Akustiksignals und entsprechendes Akustiksystem | [2006/19] | English: | Method for amplifying an acoustic signal and corresponding acoustic system | [2006/19] | French: | Procédé pour amplifier un signal acoustique et système acoustique correspondant | [2006/19] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/25] | 22.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5533120 (STAUDACHER WILLIAM [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 54 *; | [A]US2002176584 (KATES JAMES MITCHELL [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0013] ** paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0075] *; | [A]US2004109578 (NIEDERDRANK TORSTEN [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0034] * | by applicant | DE10131964 | DE10159928 |