EP1617690 - Uplink-frame at the transcoder-base-station interface in a mobile cellular radio communication network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/03] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dupuy, Pierre 14 rue Lécluse 75017, PARIS / FR | 02 /
Cruchant, Laurent 3 rue Léon Vaudoyer 75007, PARIS / FR | [2006/03] | Representative(s) | El Manouni, Josiane Alcatel-Lucent International Patent Business Site Nokia Paris Saclay Route de Villejust 91620 Nozay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/03] | El Manouni, Josiane COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Départememt Propriété Industrielle 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 05109608.9 | 06.07.1995 | [2006/03] | Priority number, date | FR19940008544 | 11.07.1994 Original published format: FR 9408544 | [2006/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1617690 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1617690 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | [2006/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/30, H04B7/26 | [2006/03] | CPC: |
H04W88/181 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2007/06] |
Former [2006/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Aufwärtsrahmen an der Transcoder-Basisstation-Schnittstelle in einem mobilen zellularen Funkübertragungsnetzwerk | [2006/03] | English: | Uplink-frame at the transcoder-base-station interface in a mobile cellular radio communication network | [2006/03] | French: | Trame montante a l'interface transcodeur-station de base dans un réseau cellulaire de radiocommunications avec des mobiles | [2006/03] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 18.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/04] | 04.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/04] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95401628.3 / EP0692919 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0600773 (ALCATEL RADIOTELEPHONE [FR]) [A] 1,7,8* abstract *; | [A]FR2700088 (ALCATEL RADIOTELEPHONE [FR]) [A] 1,7,8 * abstract * * page 8, line 34 - page 10, line 17 *; | [A] - MOULY ET AL., The GSM System for Mobile Communications, LASSAY-LES CHATEAUX FR, EUROPE MEDIA, (1992), XP000860003 [A] 1,7,8 * page 162, paragraph 3.3.2.2 * |