EP1617211 - Method of producing a sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.2006 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.06.2006 [2006/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cantion A/S Oersteds Plads, Building 347 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [2006/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREY, Hasin Francois de Charmoy Chalet Corbeau F-01170, Echenevex / FR | 02 /
JENSENIUS, Tove Maria Henriette Vasco da Gama Straat 8b 1057, VK Amsterdam / NL | 03 /
THAYSEN, Jacob Holmbladsgade 70A DK-2300, Copenhagen S / DK | 04 /
BOISEN, Anja Hasselbakken 10 DK-3460, Birkerød / DK | [2006/03] | Representative(s) | Hegner, Anette, et al NKT Research & Innovation A/S Group IP Vibeholms Allé 25 2605 Brøndby / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2006/03] | Hegner, Anette, et al NKT Research & Innovation A/S, Group IP Blokken 84 3460 Birkerod / DK | Application number, filing date | 05109776.4 | 03.05.2000 | [2006/03] | Priority number, date | DK19990000601 | 03.05.1999 Original published format: DK 60199 | US19990133240P | 07.05.1999 Original published format: US 133240 P | [2006/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1617211 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/00 | [2006/03] | CPC: |
G01N27/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2006/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Sensors | [2006/03] | English: | Method of producing a sensor | [2006/03] | French: | Methode de fabrication d'un capteur | [2006/03] | Examination procedure | 20.02.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/26] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00922475.9 / EP1207958 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS63223557 ; | [A]EP0072744 (BENDIX CORP [US]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]US4549427 (KOLESAR JR EDWARD S [US]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]US5445008 (WACHTER ERIC A [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 24 *; | [A]US5719324 (THUNDAT THOMAS G [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 6 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890118), vol. 013, no. 019, Database accession no. (P - 814), & JP63223557 A 19880919 (NEC CORP) [A] 1-21 * the whole document * |