EP1674031 - Dishwasher and method for drying wares in such dishwasher [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FagorBrandt SAS 7, rue Henri Becquerel 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | For all designated states FagorBrandt SAS 7 Rue Henri Becqueral 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | ||
Former [2008/29] | For all designated states Brandt Industries 7, rue Henri Becquerel 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | ||
Former [2006/26] | For all designated states Brandt Industries SAS 7, rue Henri Becquerel 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bretaud, Jacques Brandt Industries 25 allée des bruyères 85000, Mouilleron le Captif / FR | [2008/29] |
Former [2006/26] | 01 /
BRETAUD, Jacques Brandt Industries 25 allée des bruyères 85000, Mouilleron le Captif / FR | Application number, filing date | 05109871.3 | 24.10.2005 | [2006/26] | Priority number, date | FR20040013690 | 21.12.2004 Original published format: FR 0413690 | [2006/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1674031 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1674031 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/50 | [2006/26] | CPC: |
A47L15/50 (EP);
A47L15/26 (EP);
A47L15/48 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/26] | Title | German: | Geschirrspülmaschine und Verfahren zum Trocknen von Geschirrteilen in derselben | [2006/26] | English: | Dishwasher and method for drying wares in such dishwasher | [2006/26] | French: | Lave-vaisselle et procédé de mise en oeuvre du séchage de la vaisselle dans ce lave-vaisselle | [2006/26] | Examination procedure | 27.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 15.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.11.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.07.2008 | CY | 16.07.2008 | CZ | 16.07.2008 | DK | 16.07.2008 | EE | 16.07.2008 | FI | 16.07.2008 | IE | 16.07.2008 | LT | 16.07.2008 | LV | 16.07.2008 | NL | 16.07.2008 | PL | 16.07.2008 | RO | 16.07.2008 | SI | 16.07.2008 | SK | 16.07.2008 | TR | 16.07.2008 | BG | 16.10.2008 | SE | 16.10.2008 | GR | 17.10.2008 | LU | 24.10.2008 | BE | 31.10.2008 | MC | 31.10.2008 | IS | 16.11.2008 | PT | 16.12.2008 | HU | 17.01.2009 | [2010/52] |
Former [2010/38] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
CY | 16.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
LT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LV | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
PL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
TR | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
LU | 24.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
HU | 17.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
LT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LV | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
PL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
LU | 24.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
LT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LV | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
PL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
LT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LV | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
SE | 16.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/45] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
LT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LV | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/27] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
LT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LV | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
RO | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
CZ | 16.07.2008 | ||
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
LT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LV | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
SK | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
EE | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
LT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LV | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
DK | 16.07.2008 | ||
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
LT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LV | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 16.07.2008 | |
FI | 16.07.2008 | ||
LT | 16.07.2008 | ||
LV | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
SI | 16.07.2008 | ||
BG | 16.10.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
PT | 16.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | LT | 16.07.2008 | |
LV | 16.07.2008 | ||
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | LT | 16.07.2008 | |
NL | 16.07.2008 | ||
IS | 16.11.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE7827678U (KLASS, GEORG, ING., 8081 TUERKENFELD, DE) [A] 1,14* the whole document *; | [X]DE3625784 (RAPP HELMUT [DE]) [X] 1,2,11,14,19,20 * the whole document * |