EP1655105 - Depth stop assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [N/P] |
Former [2006/19] | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property, Feldkircherstrasse 100, Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bader, Thomas Dom.-Zimmermannstrasse 12 86899, Landsberg / DE | 02 /
Keith, Matthias Aggensteinstrasse 9c 86807, Buchloe / DE | [2006/19] | Representative(s) | Wildi, Roland Hilti Aktiengesellschaft, Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [2013/27] |
Former [2009/38] | Wildi, Roland Hilti Aktiengesellschaft, Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | ||
Former [2006/19] | Wildi, Roland Hilti Aktiengesellschaft, Corporate Intellectual Property, Feldkircherstrasse 100, Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | Application number, filing date | 05109884.6 | 24.10.2005 | [2006/19] | Priority number, date | DE20041053250 | 04.11.2004 Original published format: DE102004053250 | [2006/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1655105 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1655105 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B25B23/00, B25F5/00 | [2006/19] | CPC: |
B25F5/003 (EP,US);
B25B23/0064 (EP,US);
Y10T408/566 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, LI [2007/03] |
Former [2006/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Tiefenanschlag-Anordnung | [2006/19] | English: | Depth stop assembly | [2006/19] | French: | Dispositif de réglage de profondeur | [2006/19] | Examination procedure | 10.11.2006 | Examination requested [2006/52] | 26.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.01.2007 | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3712352 (LAFFERTY G) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US4592257 (DUERR PAUL [CH]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [DY]US5380132 (PARKS JAMES R [US]) [DY] 1,2,4,6 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0747177 (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) [Y] 1,2,4,6 * column 5, line 53 - column 6, line 7 * * column 6, line 33 - line 46 *; | [A]US2004033111 (KRIASKI JOHN ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5830132 |