EP1653619 - Protection of a power transistor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMICROELECTRONICS S.A. 29 Boulevard Romain Rolland 92120 Montrouge / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/18] | For all designated states ST MICROELECTRONICS S.A. 29 Boulevard Romain Rolland 92120 Montrouge / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fichera, Pietro 24, Avenue Jeanine Mavel Lotissement Saint Maurice 13080 Luynes / FR | [2006/24] |
Former [2006/18] | 01 /
Fichera, Pietro Parc Cézanne Bâtiment C 13080 Luynes / FR | Representative(s) | de Beaumont, Michel, et al 1bis, rue Champollion 38000 Grenoble / FR | [2006/18] | Application number, filing date | 05110042.8 | 26.10.2005 | [2006/18] | Priority number, date | FR20040052449 | 27.10.2004 Original published format: FR 0452449 | [2006/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1653619 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/12, H03K17/082 | [2011/47] | CPC: |
H03K17/0822 (EP,US);
H03K17/122 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/18] | H03K17/082 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/02] |
Former [2006/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schutzvorrichtung eines Leistungstransistor | [2006/18] | English: | Protection of a power transistor | [2006/18] | French: | Protection d'un transistor de puissance | [2006/18] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/50] | 12.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/39] | 14.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.05.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4428675 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,3,5,9 * figures 1,6-12 *; | [A]DE19841227 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,5,6 * figure 1 *; | [XA]US6054740 (BARRET JEAN [FR]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 48 - line 54 * * column 2, line 48 - line 65 * [A] 3,5,6,9; | [A]US6078204 (COOPER CHRIS [US], et al) [A] 1,5,6 * abstract * * column 1, line 27 - line 36 * * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 17 * * column 3, line 31 - line 40 *; | [A] - ANONYMOUS, "Parallel output drivers for inductive load", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, KENNETH MASON PUBLICATIONS, HAMPSHIRE, GB, (200010), vol. 438, no. 22, ISSN 0374-4353, XP007126890 [A] 1,4-6 * the whole document * | [A] - "ANNOUNCEMENT", ELECTRONIQUE, CEP COMMUNICATION, PARIS, FR, (19940301), no. 36, ISSN 1157-1152, pages 86 - 87, XP000440248 [A] 7,8 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 5 * |