26.09.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.10.2014 [2014/44] |
13.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] |
19.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
28.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] |
14.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] |
07.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] |
21.10.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] |
02.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] |
19.08.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] |
15.07.2011 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.08.2011 [2011/33] |
08.07.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] |
24.06.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2011 [2011/30] |
17.06.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2011 [2011/29] |
06.05.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2011 [2011/23] |
25.03.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] |
11.03.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] |
25.02.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] |
11.02.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2011 [2011/11] |
21.01.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] |
06.08.2010 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 08.09.2010 [2010/36] |
31.07.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
31.07.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.03.2010 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.12.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.12.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.08.2008 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] |
25.07.2008 |
First examination report |
|
24.07.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.12.2007 |
Change - applicant |
published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] |
06.12.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.11.2007 |
Publication of search report |
published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] |
22.09.2006 |
Change - inventor |
published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] |
11.08.2006 |
Change - inventor |
published on 13.09.2006 [2006/37] |
16.06.2006 |
Change - inventor |
published on 19.07.2006 [2006/29] |
02.06.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.07.2006 [2006/27] |
02.06.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.07.2006 [2006/27] |