EP1676515 - Vacuum cleaner with a dust container readily loadable in the cleaner's body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2011 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DE | published on 29.10.2014 [2014/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/04] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | ||
Former [2006/27] | For all designated states LG Electronic Inc. 20, Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Min, Young Gun 313-803, Towol Sungwon Apt., Sangnam-dong Changwon-si, Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | [2006/43] |
Former [2006/37] | 01 /
Min, Young Gun 303-803, Sungwon Towol Apt., Sangnam-dong Changwon-si, Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | ||
Former [2006/29] | 01 /
Min, Young Gun 303-803, Sungwon Towol Apt., Sangnam-dong Changwon-si, Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | ||
Former [2006/27] | 01 /
Min, Young Gun 101-1903, Sungwon Towol Apt., Sangnam-dong Changwon-si, Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/27] | Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05110355.4 | 04.11.2005 | [2006/27] | Priority number, date | KR20050000489 | 04.01.2005 Original published format: KR 2005000489 | [2006/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1676515 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1676515 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | [2008/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1676515 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/14, A47L9/16 | [2006/27] | CPC: |
A47L9/1641 (EP);
A47L9/10 (KR);
A47L9/00 (KR);
A47L9/1625 (EP);
A47L9/1683 (EP);
A47L9/1691 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/27] | Title | German: | Staubsauger mit einem Staubauffangbehälter, der in einfacher Weise im Staubsaugergehäuse angeordnet wird | [2006/27] | English: | Vacuum cleaner with a dust container readily loadable in the cleaner's body | [2006/27] | French: | Aspirateur avec un conteneur poussières facilement chargeable dans le caisson de l'aspirateur | [2006/27] | Examination procedure | 04.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/27] | 30.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.09.2010 | BE | 08.09.2010 | CY | 08.09.2010 | CZ | 08.09.2010 | DK | 08.09.2010 | EE | 08.09.2010 | FI | 08.09.2010 | IT | 08.09.2010 | LT | 08.09.2010 | LV | 08.09.2010 | NL | 08.09.2010 | PL | 08.09.2010 | RO | 08.09.2010 | SE | 08.09.2010 | SI | 08.09.2010 | SK | 08.09.2010 | TR | 08.09.2010 | IE | 04.11.2010 | LU | 04.11.2010 | CH | 30.11.2010 | FR | 30.11.2010 | LI | 30.11.2010 | MC | 30.11.2010 | BG | 08.12.2010 | GR | 09.12.2010 | ES | 19.12.2010 | IS | 08.01.2011 | PT | 10.01.2011 | HU | 09.03.2011 | DE | 31.05.2011 | [2014/44] |
Former [2013/42] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
TR | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 04.11.2010 | ||
LU | 04.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
FR | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
BG | 08.12.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
HU | 09.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
BG | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
TR | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 04.11.2010 | ||
LU | 04.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
FR | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
HU | 09.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
BG | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 04.11.2010 | ||
LU | 04.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
FR | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
HU | 09.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
BG | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 04.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
FR | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
HU | 09.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
BG | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 04.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
FR | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 04.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
FR | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
IT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
PL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
LT | 08.09.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1023864 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [X]JP2004049792 (TOSHIBA TEC KK) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [XA]WO2004034866 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6 * page 1, line 8 - page 8, line 7 * * page 8, line 28 - page 13, line 14; figures 1-5 * [A] 2,4,7,8; | [A]GB2396832 (SAMSUNG KWANGJU ELECTRONICS CO [KR]) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [X]JP2004290212 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1 * abstract *; | US2006117519 [ ] (BOCK ARMIN [DE], et al) | by applicant | WO2004034866 |